|
GPO
Sep 12 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION - For the reasons set forth above, the DRN's Motion For Leave to Intervene. (Doc. 10). will be granted. A separate order follows.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/12/16. (jfg)
|
|
GPO
Sep 12 2016
ORDER upon consideration of Maya K. Van Rossum and the Delaware Riverkeeper Network's Motion to Intervene, (Doc. 10). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: the Motion to Intervene is GRANTED.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/12/16. (jfg)
|
|
GPO
Dec 15 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION- For the reasons set forth above, the motions will be granted in part and denied in part. A separate order follows.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 12/15/16. (jfg)
|
|
GPO
Dec 15 2016
ORDER 1. Non-parties Lackawaxen Honesdale Shippers Association, Northern Wayne Property Owner's Alliance, Inc., and Landowner Advocates of New York, Inc.'s Motion for Permission to Appear, File Brief, and Make Oral Argument if Necessary, (Doc. 37), is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Non-parties Lackawaxen Honesdale Shippers Association, Northern Wayne Property Owner's Alliance, Inc., and Landowner Advocates of New York, Inc. may file a joint brief, not to exceed ten pages, as amicus curiae on behalf of the Plaintiff. No other participation will be permitted. 2. Non-parties County of Wayne and Wayne Economic Development Council's Motion for Permission to Appear, File Brief, and Make Oral Argument if Necessary, (Doc. 53), is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Non-parties County of Wayne and Wayne Economic Development Council may file a joint brief, not to exceed ten pages, as amicus curiae on behalf of the Plaintiff. No other participation will be permitted. 3. All briefs shall be due within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 12/15/16. (jfg)
|
|
GPO
Jan 05 2017
MEMORANDUM For the reasons set forth above, the Court will deny the Senators' Motion to Intervene. A separate Order follows.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 1/5/17. (jfg)
|
|
GPO
Jan 05 2017
ORDER 1. Senators Joseph B. Scarnati, Lisa Baker, and Gene Yaw's Motion toIntervene, (Doc. 35), is DENIED. 2. However, Senators Joseph B. Scarnati, Lisa Baker, and Gene Yaw may file a joint brief, not to exceed ten pages, as amicus curiae on behalf of the Plaintiff. No other participation will be permitted.3. The brief shall be due within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 1/5/17. (jfg)
|
|
GPO
Jan 05 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION For the reasons set forth above, the Court will deny the DCS's Motions to Intervene. A separate Order follows.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 1/5/17. (jfg)
|
|
GPO
Jan 05 2017
ORDER 1. Damascus Citizens for Sustainability, Inc.'s Motion to Intervene, (Doc. 49), is DENIED. 2. However, Damascus Citizens for Sustainability, Inc.'s may file a brief, not to exceed ten pages, as amicus curiae on behalf of the Defendant. No other pal1icipation will be permitted.3. The brief shall be due within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 1/5/17. (jfg)
|
|
GPO
Mar 23 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION - For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, (Doc. 12), will be granted. A separate order follows.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 3/23/17. (jfg)
|
|
GPO
Mar 23 2017
ORDER upon consideration of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, (Doc. 12), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendant's Motion, (Doc. 12), is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. 2. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 3/23/17. (jfg)
|
|
GPO
May 14 2019
MEMORANDUM OPINION (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 108 MOTION to Intervene As Parties Plaintiff filed by Gene Yaw, Lisa Baker, Joseph B. Scarnati, III. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 5/14/19. (jam)
|
|
GPO
May 14 2019
ORDER denying 108 Senators Joseph B. Scarnati, Lisa Baker, and Gene Yaw's Motion to Intervene as Parties Plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 5/14/19 (jam)
|
|
GPO
Jun 04 2019
MEMORANDUM OPINION (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 116 MOTION to Compel Discovery MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Delaware River Basin Commission. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 6/4/19. (jam)
|
|
GPO
Jan 31 2020
MEMORANDUM OPINION (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 138 MOTION to Compel.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 1/31/20. (jam)
|
|
GPO
Feb 14 2020
***AMENDED. SEE ORDER DATED FEBRUARY 21, 2020 (Doc. 168) ***MEMORANDUM OPINION(Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 152 MOTION to Compel filed by Wayne Land and Mineral Group, LLC.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 2/14/20. (jam) Modified on 2/21/2020 (jam).
|
|
GPO
Feb 14 2020
*** AMENDED. SEE ORDER DATED FEBRUARY 21, 2020 (Doc. 168) *** ORDER granting in part and denying in part 152 Motion to Compel. See Order for specific details. The parties shall meet and confer about the protection of the confidential information contained in Document Number 7 and report to the Court within 7 days of the date of this Order if they are unable to reach agreement on this matter. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 2/14/20 (jam) Modified on 2/21/2020 (jam).
|
|
GPO
Jan 06 2021
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 169 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Delaware River Basin Commission. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 1/6/21. (jam)
|
|
GPO
Jan 06 2021
ORDER denying 169 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 1/6/21 (jam)
|