Miami-Luken, Inc. v. Drug Enforcement Agency
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Susan J Dlott |
Referred: | Stephanie K Bowman |
Case #: | 1:16-mc-00012 |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | May 18, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 18, 2016 6:09 AM EST |
Defendant
Drug Enforcement Agency
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miami-Luken, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
49 | 49
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/18 4:18 PM
ORDER denying48 Consent Suggestion of Mootness. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 4/18/19. (wam) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2019 | ||
48 | 48
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/20 5:56 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Drug Enforcement Agency (Consent Suggestion of Mootness) (Riess, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, January 02, 2019 | ||
47 | 47
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Wed 01/02 3:17 PM
ORDER ADOPTING44 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 1/2/2019. Miami-Luken's37 Motion to Enforce Judgment is GRANTED and the DEA's38 Motion to Set Aside Judgment is DENIED. (eh) |
|
Friday, November 16, 2018 | ||
46 | 46
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Fri 11/16 9:30 PM
OBJECTION to44 Report and Recommendations by Defendant Drug Enforcement Agency. (Riess, Daniel) |
|
Monday, November 05, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 11/05 6:58 AM
ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlot granting45 Motion for Extension of Time to File objections to the Report and Recommendation until November 16, 2018. (vp) |
||
Friday, November 02, 2018 | ||
45 | 45
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 11/02 4:58 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 11/16/2018. Objections to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation by Defendant Drug Enforcement Agency. (Riess, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, October 24, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
motion
Report and Recommendations
Wed 10/24 10:47 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT: (1) Miami-Luken's Motion to Enforce this Court's 4/21/2017 Order37 should be GRANTED and the DEA be directed to comply with the subpoena within 21 days of any Order adopting this R&R; (2) The DEA's Renewed Rule 60(b) motion38 should be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 11/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 10/24/2018. (km) |
|
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Mon 10/22 1:13 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Daniel Riess substituting for Peter J. Phipps as to Defendant Drug Enforcement Agency. (Riess, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 10/10 5:23 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re38 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment filed by Defendant Drug Enforcement Agency. (Phipps, Peter) |
|
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 09/27 9:58 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re37 MOTION to Enforce Judgment filed by Plaintiff Miami-Luken, Inc.. (Dowdell Armstrong, Jennifer) |
|
misc
Notice of Corrective Docket Entry
Thu 09/27 3:59 PM
Notice of Correction: Please be aware that docs.40 and41 are identical pleadings filed twice, at the request of clerk, to capture both the Response and Reply in ECF. (eh) |
||
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 09/26 5:37 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re37 MOTION to Enforce Judgment ,38 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment filed by Plaintiff Miami-Luken, Inc.. (Dowdell Armstrong, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 09/12 5:57 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re37 MOTION to Enforce Judgment filed by Defendant Drug Enforcement Agency. (Phipps, Peter) |
|
38 | 38
motion
Set Aside Judgment
Wed 09/12 5:47 PM
MOTION to Set Aside Judgment by Defendant Drug Enforcement Agency. (Phipps, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Enforce Judgment
Tue 08/28 10:07 AM
MOTION to Enforce Judgment by Plaintiff Miami-Luken, Inc.. (Dowdell Armstrong, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit August 17, 2018 Sixth Circuit Opinion | ||
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
1
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Tue 10/24 10:30 AM
ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlott ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; defendant DEA's Rule 60(b)(6) motion seeking relief from the Court's April 21, 2017 final order and to set aside the court's judgment is DENIED without prejudice to renew following the conclusion of the related case in the sixth circuit court of appeals. (vp) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Response (non motion)
Tue 08/29 3:41 PM
Response re34 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Miami-Luken, Inc.. (Dowdell Armstrong, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Tue 08/15 10:38 PM
OBJECTION to33 Report and Recommendations by Defendant Drug Enforcement Agency. (Phipps, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 08/01 10:36 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re27 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment filed by Drug Enforcement Agency. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT Defendant DEA's Rule 60(b) motion seeking relief from this Court's 4/21/2017 final Order and to set aside the Court's judgment27 should be DENIED, without prejudice to renew (if appropriate) following the conclusion of the related case in the Sixth Circuit. Objections to R&R due by 8/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 8/1/2017. (km) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 06/15 4:53 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Miami-Luken, Inc. Joint Notice of Related Case (Dowdell Armstrong, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 06/14 10:00 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 6/14/2017. (jlw) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 06/09 5:34 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re27 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment filed by Defendant Drug Enforcement Agency. (Phipps, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 05/30 10:25 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re27 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment CORRECTED filed by Plaintiff Miami-Luken, Inc.. (Dowdell Armstrong, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit ALJ May 15, 2017 Stay Order | ||
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 05/26 8:24 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re27 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment filed by Plaintiff Miami-Luken, Inc.. (Dowdell Armstrong, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit ALJ May 15, 2017 Stay Order | ||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Set Aside Judgment
Fri 05/19 5:31 PM
MOTION to Set Aside Judgment by Defendant Drug Enforcement Agency. (Phipps, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Tue 05/16 9:27 AM
ORDER granting25 Motion to Stay compliance with the April 21 Order pending the later of the resolution of DEA's forthcoming motion for relief from judgment or any appeal of the Court's Judgment has been resolved. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 5/16/17. (wam) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Stay
Fri 05/12 4:54 PM
Emergency MOTION to Stay re24 Order Dismissing Case by Defendant Drug Enforcement Agency. (Phipps, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 04/21 1:37 PM
ORDER Terminating Case from the Docket. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 4/21/2017. (jlw) Modified to clarify docket text on 4/21/2017 (jlw) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Transcript
Fri 02/24 2:08 PM
Transcript of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on February 17, 2017, before Judge Susan J. Dlott. Court Reporter: Julie Wolfer (Official). Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 3/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/25/2017. (Wolfer, Julie) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
minutes
Motion Hearing
Fri 02/17 1:07 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan J. Dlott: Motion Hearing held on 2/17/2017 re18 Objection to Magistrate Judge Orderre15 Memorandum and Order. Matter taken under submission. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: Julie Wolfer) (wam) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 01/18 1:43 PM
The oral argument set for February 8, 2017 has been RESET for February 17, 2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Susan J. Dlott in Courtroom 4, Room 842. (vp) |
||
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Fri 01/13 10:04 AM
NOTICE of Oral Argument on Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Cincinnati before Judge Susan J. Dlott. (vp) |
|
Tuesday, October 18, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 10/18 4:50 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re18 Objection to Magistrate Judge Orderre15 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by Defendant Drug Enforcement Agency. (Phipps, Peter) |
|
Friday, October 07, 2016 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 10/07 10:40 AM
The DEA has been granted permission to file a reply brief to he Magistrate Judge's Order15 . They have until 10/18/16 to file their brief. (wam) |
||
Tuesday, September 06, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
18
pgs
misc
Response (non motion)
Tue 09/06 4:06 PM
Response re18 Objection to Magistrate Judge Orderre15 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Plaintiff Miami-Luken, Inc.. (Dowdell Armstrong, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, August 22, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Objection to Magistrate Judge Order
Mon 08/22 3:06 PM
Objection to Magistrate Judge Orderre15 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Defendant Drug Enforcement Agency. Responses due by 9/6/2016 (Phipps, Peter) |
|
misc
Notice of Corrective Docket Entry
Mon 08/22 2:03 PM
Notice of Correction: re [FORMER DOC. 17] Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court restricted by clerk due to incorrect filing event used. Counsel is instructed to refile using the event Objection to Magistrate Judge Order. The path is as follows: Civil Events - Motions and Related Filings - Motions - Objection to Magistrate Judge Order (jee) |
||
Friday, August 19, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court
Fri 08/19 6:05 PM
APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Defendant Drug Enforcement Agency re15 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Phipps, Peter) |
|
Friday, July 29, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 07/29 4:09 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting16 Drug Enforcement Administration's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time Until 8/19/2016 to File Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order of 7/15/201615 . The DEA's compliance with the Magistrate Judge's Order is further STAYED pending the filing of its Objections. If no objections are filed by the extended deadline of 8/19/2016, the stay will be lifted and the DEA will be required to comply with the Order within 21 days of the 8/19/2016 deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 7/29/2016. (km) |
||
Thursday, July 28, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 07/28 2:47 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 8/19/2016. by Defendant Drug Enforcement Agency. (Phipps, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 15, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 07/15 5:01 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part1 Plaintiff's Motion Enforce Chief Administrative Law Judge John J. Mulrooney, II's Order for DEA to Produce Documents, Pursuant to Subpoena Duces-Tecum Issued April 18, 2016. IT IS ORDERED that the DEA abide by the subpoena as limited by this Order. Such response shall be produced within 21 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 7/15/2016. (km) |
|
Tuesday, July 05, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/05 5:33 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Drug Enforcement Agency re11 Response in Opposition to Motion, Extension of Administrative Stay (Phipps, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit | ||
Friday, July 01, 2016 | ||
misc
Notice of Corrective Docket Entry
Fri 07/01 8:49 AM
Notice of Correction: Please disregard [FORMER DOC. 12] Reply - filed using and incorrect ECF event. Counsel properly refiled as13 Reply to Response to Motion. (eh) |
||
Tuesday, June 28, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 06/28 12:41 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re1 Emergency MOTION Enforce Chief Administrative Law Judge John J. Mulrooney, II's Order for DEA to Produce Documents, Pursuant to Subpoena Duces-Tecum Issued April 18, 2016 filed by Plaintiff Miami-Luken, Inc.. (Dowdell Armstrong, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, June 27, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Reply (non motion)
Mon 06/27 5:07 PM
Reply re1 Emergency MOTION Enforce Chief Administrative Law Judge John J. Mulrooney, II's Order for DEA to Produce Documents, Pursuant to Subpoena Duces-Tecum Issued April 18, 2016 by Plaintiff Miami-Luken, Inc.. (Dowdell Armstrong, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, June 16, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
22
pgs
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 06/16 10:06 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re1 Emergency MOTION Enforce Chief Administrative Law Judge John J. Mulrooney, II's Order for DEA to Produce Documents, Pursuant to Subpoena Duces-Tecum Issued April 18, 2016 filed by Defendant Drug Enforcement Agency. (Phipps, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Louis Milione, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Anthony Williams, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
Friday, May 27, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 05/27 3:04 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Miami-Luken, Inc. of Filing Corrected Exhibit 2 to1 Emergency MOTION Enforce Chief Administrative Law Judge John J. Mulrooney, II's Order for DEA to Produce Documents, Pursuant to Subpoena Duces-Tecum Issued April 18, 2016 (Dowdell Armstrong, Jennifer) Modified to Clarify Docket Text on 5/27/2016 (km) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Revised Exhibit/Order to Show Cause | ||
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 05/27 9:42 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting9 Plaintiff's Motion For Leave to Replace Exhibit 2 to1 Emergency MOTION Enforce Chief Administrative Law Judge John J. Mulrooney, II's Order for DEA to Produce Documents, Pursuant to Subpoena Duces-Tecum Issued April 18, 2016. Plaintiff shall electronically file the corrected Exhibit 2 to their motion under a notice of filing forthwith. Upon the filing of the corrected exhibit, the Clerk shall restrict access of the previously filed exhibit on the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 5/27/2016. (km) |
||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Fri 05/27 12:54 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman: Telephone Conference re: Briefing Schedule on1 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Enforce held on 5/27/2016. Attorneys Richard Blake, Jennifer Armstrong and Larry Cote appeared on behave of Miami-Luken. Attorney Peter Phipps appeared on behalf of the Drug Enforcement Administration. Defendant has until 6/16/2016 to file a response to the motion. Plaintiff will file its reply brief on or before 6/27/2016. (km) |
||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 05/27 12:55 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to1 Emergency MOTION Enforce Chief Administrative Law Judge John J. Mulrooney, II's Order for DEA to Produce Documents, Pursuant to Subpoena Duces-Tecum Issued April 18, 2016. Defendant's Response due by 6/16/2016 Plaintiff's Reply due by 6/27/2016. (km) |
||
Thursday, May 26, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 05/26 3:25 PM
MOTION For Leave to Replace Exhibit 2 to its Previously Filed: re1 Emergency MOTION Enforce Chief Administrative Law Judge John J. Mulrooney, II's Order for DEA to Produce Documents, Pursuant to Subpoena Duces-Tecum Issued April 18, 2016 by Plaintiff Miami-Luken, Inc.. (Dowdell Armstrong, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Revised Order to Show Cause, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Telephone Conference
Thu 05/26 10:18 AM
NOTICE: Telephone Conference re: Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce1 set for 5/27/2016 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Counsel to call 1-888-363-4749; access code: 8651321; security code: 2010 . (km) |
|
Tuesday, May 24, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/24 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Joseph Phipps for Defendant Drug Enforcement Agency (Phipps, Peter) |
|
Monday, May 23, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Mon 05/23 4:05 PM
ORDER re1 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Enforce Chief Administrative Law Judge John J. Mulrooney IIs Order for the DEA to Produce Documents Pursuant to Subpoena Duces Tecum issued 4/18/2016. In order to ensure prompt resolution of this matter, the Court hereby establishes the following expedited briefing schedule: (1) Defendant shall file its response in opposition to the motion no later than Tuesday, 5/31/2016; and (2) Plaintiff shall file any reply memorandum in support of its motion no later than Friday, 6/3/2016. No further briefing will be permitted except by leave of Court. The Court shall consider this matter upon completion of all briefing. The Court shall also conduct any conferences or hearings that may be deemed necessary. As counsel for Defendant has yet to enter an appearance in this matter, the Clerk shall serve by mail a copy of this Order upon counsel for Defendant Anthony Yim, Esq. and Robert Walker, Esq., Drug Enforcement Administration, Office of Chief Counsel, 8701 Morrissette Drive, Springfield, VA 22152 and by email at Anthony.S.Yim@usdoj.gov and Robert.Walker@usdoj.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 5/23/2016. (km) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 05/23 3:29 PM
Filing fee: $ 46.00, receipt number 100CIN028445. (jee) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 05/23 9:43 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Larry P. Cote. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 5/23/16. (wam) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 05/23 4:33 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to1 Emergency MOTION Enforce Chief Administrative Law Judge John J. Mulrooney, II's Order for DEA to Produce Documents, Pursuant to Subpoena Duces-Tecum Issued April 18, 2016. Defendant's Response due by 5/31/2016. Plaintiff's Reply due by 6/3/2016. (km) |
||
Thursday, May 19, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Thu 05/19 2:00 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Larry P. Cote (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5505062) by Plaintiff Miami-Luken, Inc.. (Dowdell Armstrong, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/19 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong for Plaintiff Miami-Luken, Inc. (Dowdell Armstrong, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, May 18, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 05/18 3:23 PM
Emergency MOTION Enforce Chief Administrative Law Judge John J. Mulrooney, II's Order for DEA to Produce Documents, Pursuant to Subpoena Duces-Tecum Issued April 18, 2016 by Plaintiff Miami-Luken, Inc.. Responses due by 6/13/2016 (Blake, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Order to Show Cause, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Initial Subpoena Requst, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Omnibus Order, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Subpoena Request, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Order Granting Modified Subpoena Request, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Subpoena with Proof of Service, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Gov't Motion for Reconsideration, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Government Notice, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Motion for Stay, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Gov't Response to Motion for Stay, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Order Granting Motion for Stay |