Hargrove v. State of Ohio et al
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | John R Adams |
Case #: | 5:16-cv-01238 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | May 23, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 12, 2016 |
Defendant
State of Ohio
|
|
Defendant
Summit County
|
|
Plaintiff
Daniel P. Hargrove
|
GPO
Sep 12 2016
Memorandum Opinion and Order dismissing this matter under Section 1915A. An appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. Judge John R. Adams on 9/12/16. (K,C) |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 08/14 8:29 AM
True copy of order from the USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Dismissing the appeal for want of prosecution re16 . The proper fee was not paid by 8/4/17 (USCA# 16-4134 . Date issued by USCA 8/10/17 (H,SP) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 10/31 2:51 PM
True copy of order from the USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Dismissing the17 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 16-4204 . Date issued by USCA 10/31/16 (H,SP) |
|
Tuesday, October 25, 2016 | ||
appeal
Acknowledgment from the USCA
Tue 10/25 4:18 PM
Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of17 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 16-4204 . Date filed in USCA 10/25/16. (H,SP) |
||
Tuesday, October 18, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 10/19 2:57 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals from the10 Memorandum Opinion and Order and11 Judgment, filed by Daniel P. Hargrove. Filing fee not paid. (H,SP) |
|
Friday, October 07, 2016 | ||
appeal
Acknowledgment from the USCA
Fri 10/07 2:38 PM
Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of16 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 16-4134 . Date filed in USCA 10/5/16. (H,SP) |
||
Tuesday, October 04, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 10/04 11:49 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals from the10 Memorandum Opinion and Order and11 Judgment Entry of 9/12/16, filed by Daniel P. Hargrove. Filing fee not paid. (S,HR) |
|
Monday, October 03, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
oth_doc
Affidavit/Declaration
Tue 10/04 7:55 AM
Affidavit of Commercial Discharge Application, Jurisdictional Challenge, Reservation of Rights filed by Daniel P. Hargrove. (H,SP) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
oth_evt
Returned Mail
Mon 09/26 3:25 PM
Returned Mail addressed to Party Daniel P. Hargrove. Refused, Unable to Forward. Document re-mailed to updated address: #A690144, Lorain Correctional Institution, 2075 S. Avon Belden Road, Grafton, OH 44044 . (H,SP) |
|
Tuesday, September 20, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
oth_evt
Returned Mail
Tue 09/20 12:42 PM
Returned Mail addressed to Party Daniel P. Hargrove. Updated address found per Ohio BOP and documents re-mailed to updated address. Related document(s)11 and10 . (H,KR) |
|
Wednesday, September 14, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
oth_doc
Affidavit/Declaration
Thu 09/15 2:19 PM
Affidavit of Daniel P. Hargrove in support of status of case (H,SP) |
|
Tuesday, September 13, 2016 | ||
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Tue 09/13 7:45 AM
Copy of11 Judgment and10 Memorandum Opinion and Order mailed to Daniel P. Hargrove at Summit County Jail on 9/13/16. Related document(s)11 ,10 . (K,C) |
||
Monday, September 12, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment
Mon 09/12 12:25 PM
Judgment Entry dismissing this matter. An appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. Judge John R. Adams on 9/12/16. (K,C) |
|
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion and Order
Mon 09/12 12:22 PM
Memorandum Opinion and Order dismissing this matter under Section 1915A. An appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. Judge John R. Adams on 9/12/16. (K,C) |
|
Wednesday, August 31, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
oth_doc
Affidavit/Declaration
Wed 08/31 4:28 PM
Affidavit in support of commercial discharge filed by Daniel P. Hargrove. (H,SP) |
|
Monday, August 01, 2016 | ||
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Tue 08/02 10:52 AM
Copy of8 Letter mailed to Daniel P. Hargrove at #191465, Summit County Jail, 205 E. Crosier Street, Akron, OH. 44311 on 8/2/16. . (H,SP) |
||
Friday, July 29, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
oth_doc
Letter
Mon 08/01 4:10 PM
Letter filed by Daniel P. Hargrove. (H,SP) |
|
Friday, July 01, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
oth_doc
Affidavit/Declaration
Fri 07/01 3:56 PM
Affidavit of Prisoner filed by Daniel P. Hargrove . (H,SP) |
|
Friday, June 10, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
oth_doc
Affidavit/Declaration
Fri 06/10 2:14 PM
Affidavit in support of commercial discharge application, reservation of rights filed by Daniel P. Hargrove. (H,SP) |
|
5 | 5
oth_doc
Supplement
Fri 06/10 2:13 PM
Supplement (Civil Cover Sheet) to1 Complaint filed by Daniel P. Hargrove. (H,SP) |
|
Monday, June 06, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Mon 06/06 10:29 AM
Order directing the Plaintiff to either pay the full filing fee of $400, or to complete and submit the accompanying Financial Application within 30 days of the date of this order. Judge John R. Adams on 6/6/16.(K,C) |
|
Att: 1 Financial Application | ||
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Mon 06/06 10:46 AM
Copy of4 Order mailed to Daniel P. Hargrove at Summit County Jail on 6/6/16. Related document(s)4 . (K,C) |
||
Tuesday, May 31, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
oth_doc
Letter
Wed 06/01 10:03 AM
Letter filed by Daniel P. Hargrove. (H,SP) |
|
2 | 2
oth_doc
Supplement
Wed 06/01 8:41 AM
Supplement to1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet filed by Daniel P. Hargrove. Only 1st page filed, blank cover sheet mailed to plaintiff to fill in second page. . (H,SP) |
|
Tuesday, May 24, 2016 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Tue 05/24 9:45 AM
Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (S,SR) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Tue 05/24 9:46 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (S,SR) |
||
oth_evt
Remark re Civil Cover Sheet Remark re Pro Se Service
Tue 05/24 9:48 AM
Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of a Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a). Without the Civil Cover Sheet, the Clerk does not know if this case is related to or is a refiling of a pending/terminated case in this Court. Copy of1 Complaint, blank civil cover sheet and prisoner packet mailed to Daniel P. Hargrove #191465 at Summit County Jail 205 E. Crosier St. Akron, OH 44311 on 5/24/2016. (S,SR) |
||
Monday, May 23, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 05/24 9:45 AM
Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee not paid. Filed by Daniel P. Hargrove. (S,SR) |