Tsuhlares v. Adriatic Marine, LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Ivan Lr Lemelle |
Referred: | Joseph C Wilkinson, Jr |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-07243 |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Cause | 46:30104 Marine Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 27, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 20, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 23, 2016 3:45 AM CST |
Defendant
Adriatic Marine, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bailey's Catering, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Jason Tsuhlares
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 01/20 11:06 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. In view of Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissalof the captioned matter . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the captioned case is hereby CLOSED. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 1/19/2017.(cg) |
|
Tuesday, June 07, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 06/07 4:55 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Adriatic Marine, LLC and Bailey's Catering, LLC by Jason Tsuhlares. (Curtis, Lawrence) |
|
Friday, June 03, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/03 10:14 AM
Summons Issued as to Adriatic Marine, LLC, Bailey's Catering, LLC.(ijg) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
3 | 3
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Fri 06/03 10:09 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re1 Complaint; Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Summons forms. The pdf should not have the pink header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (ijg) |
|
Wednesday, June 01, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 06/01 4:12 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (mmv) |
|
Friday, May 27, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 05/27 2:21 PM
COMPLAINT against Adriatic Marine, LLC, Bailey's Catering, LLC (Prepayment of fee not required pursuant to 28 USC 1916) filed by Jason Tsuhlares.Attorney Lawrence Neil Curtis added to party Jason Tsuhlares(pty:pla).(Curtis, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons |