Hawkes Co., Inc. et al v. United States Army Corps Of Engineers
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Ann D Montgomery |
Referred: | Tony N Leung |
Case #: | 0:13-cv-00107 |
Nature of Suit | 893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters |
Cause | Federal Water Pollution Control Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2013 |
Re-opened: | Sep 23, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jan 24, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 12, 2015 2:36 AM CST |
Amicus
Pacific Legal Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Army Corps of Engineers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hawkes Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LPF Properties, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pierce Investment Company
|
Represented By
|
1. | The Army Corps of Abuse (wsj.com) |
Submitted Thu 06/02/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
86 | 86
order
Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
Wed 01/25 8:40 AM
JUDGMENT(AKL) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal | ||
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
85 | 85
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Tue 01/24 4:17 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting49 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying79 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 01/24/2017. (TLU) |