TMC Franchise Corporation v. SB Gas and Wash Management Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | John J Tuchi |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-01702 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 20, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 27, 2016 2:37 AM MST |
Defendant
Ahmad Abadi
SB Gas and Wash Management Incorporated 10660 Wilshire Blvd. #409
Los Angeles, CA 90024 |
|
Defendant
SB Gas and Wash Management Incorporated
SB Gas and Wash Management Incorporated 10660 Wilshire Blvd. #409
Los Angeles, CA 90024 |
|
Plaintiff
TMC Franchise Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 20, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
minute_ord
~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 10/05 9:23 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Civil Case Terminated pursuant to21 Order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 07/20 10:57 AM
ORDER granting the parties' Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice (Doc.20 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERD dismissing this matter with prejudice and instructing the Clerk to close the matter. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/19/2016. (KMG) |
|
Tuesday, July 19, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 07/19 2:20 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by TMC Franchise Corporation. (Rotchadl, Nick) |
|
Tuesday, June 28, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 06/28 1:39 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the Stipulation (Doc.18 ). Defendants have until July 18, 2016, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc.1 ). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/28/16. (JAMA) |
|
Friday, June 24, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint
Fri 06/24 1:58 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by TMC Franchise Corporation.(Rotchadl, Nick) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, June 13, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
service
Service Executed
Mon 06/13 7:37 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by TMC Franchise Corporation: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet upon SB Gas and Wash Management, Inc. on 6/6/2016. (Rotchadl, Nick) |
|
16 | 16
service
Service Executed
Mon 06/13 7:37 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by TMC Franchise Corporation: Proof of Service re: Complaint & Civil Cover Sheet upon Ahmad Abadi on 6/6/2016. (Rotchadl, Nick) |
|
Monday, June 06, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information
Mon 06/06 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by TMC Franchise Corporation. (Rotchadl, Nick) |
|
Thursday, June 02, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/02 2:43 PM
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/02 2:42 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Kara D Lyons on behalf of TMC Franchise Corporation. (BAS) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/02 2:41 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Nick R Rotchadl on behalf of TMC Franchise Corporation. (BAS) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 06/02 8:38 AM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on August 29, 2016. (See attached Order for complete details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/2/16. (JAMA) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order
Thu 06/02 8:36 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order on defendants. (See attached Order for additional details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/2/16. (JAMA) |
|
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
Thu 06/02 2:42 PM
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX172609 as to Nick R Rotchadl. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
Thu 06/02 2:43 PM
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX172610 as to Kara D Lyons. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Wednesday, June 01, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/01 2:41 PM
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 terminating4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/01 1:14 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Kerry L. Bundy by TMC Franchise Corporation. (Bundy, Kerry) |
|
7 | 7
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Initial Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information
Wed 06/01 1:12 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (REK) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/01 1:11 PM
Summons Issued as to Ahmad Abadi, SB Gas and Wash Management Incorporated.(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
Wed 06/01 2:41 PM
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX172505 as to Kerry L Bundy. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Tuesday, May 31, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
New Case Opened
Wed 06/01 1:09 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-13020985. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J. Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 16-01702 PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/01 1:06 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of attorney Kerry L Bundy by TMC Franchise Corporation. (submitted by Kerry Bundy) (REK) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Submitted
Wed 06/01 1:05 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by TMC Franchise Corporation. (submitted by Kerry Bundy)(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 06/01 1:03 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by TMC Franchise Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Couche-Tard U.S. Incorporated, Corporate Parent Circle K Delaware Incorporated, Corporate Parent Circle K Stores Incorporated, Corporate Parent Alimentation Couche-Tard Incorporated, Corporate Parent Circle K Corporation for TMC Franchise Corporation. (submitted by Kerry Bundy) (REK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/01 12:58 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-13020985 filed by TMC Franchise Corporation. (submitted by Kerry Bundy)(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet |