Hoof v. USA
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Roslyn O Silver |
Referred: | James F Metcalf |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-01723 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 26, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago |
Friday, April 12, 2019 | ||
49 | 49
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 04/12 2:49 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Ronnie Lee Hoof. Reason for return: Return to Sender-Refused-Unable to Forward. Document number48 . (GMP) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
47 | 47
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 03/12 3:02 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Ronnie Lee Hoof. Reason for return: Transferred/Discharged. Document number46 . (LAD) |
|
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
48 | 48
order
Clerks Judgment
Wed 04/03 9:14 AM
AMENDED CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that in accordance with the Court's Order filed January 18, 2019, movants motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255 to vacate, set aside or correct a sentence is dismissed and the civil action opened in connection is hereby terminated. (MSA) |
|
46 | 46
order
Clerks Judgment
Tue 02/26 9:50 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that in accordance with the Court's Order filed January 18, 2019, Petitioner's motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255 to vacate, set aside or correct a sentence is denied and the civil action opened in connection is hereby dismissed without prejudice. (MSA) |
|
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
45 | 45
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 01/29 11:28 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Ronnie Lee Hoof. Reason for return: Transferred / Discharged / Vacant. Document number44 . (SLQ) |
|
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
44 | 44
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 01/18 1:29 PM
ORDER: No later than February 15, 2019, Petitioner shall file a statement explaining how he wishes to proceed in this case. The Clerk of Court shall enter a judgment of dismissal without prejudice on February 25, 2019, if Petitioner does not file a response to this Order before that date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Report & Recommendation39 is REJECTED AS MOOT. The revised Report & Recommendation42 remains pending. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 1/18/2019. (REK) |
|
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
43 | 43
motion
Dismiss Case Strike
Fri 01/18 9:14 AM
MOTION to Counsel Petition and MOTION to Strike from Record by Ronnie Lee Hoof. (SLQ) (2 pages) |
|
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
motion
Report and Recommendation
Tue 07/17 12:04 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED that the Movant's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255, filed May 31, 2016 (Doc.1 ) be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that, to the extent the foregoing findings and recommendations are adopted in the District Court's order, a Certificate of Appealability be GRANTED. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 7/17/18. (LAD) |
|
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 05/09 2:02 PM
ORDER this case is referred to Magistrate Judge James F. Metcalf for the purpose of revising the Report and Recommendation39 in this case. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 5/9/18. (CLB) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendation
Thu 08/24 8:07 AM
OBJECTION to39 Report and Recommendation filed by Ronnie Lee Hoof. (SLQ) (3 pages) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Report and Recommendation
Fri 08/11 7:48 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that1 Movant's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255 be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that, to the extent the foregoing findings and recommendations are adopted in the District Court's order, a Certificate of Appealability be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 8/10/17. (LSP) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Reply to Response to Motion (2255)
Wed 06/07 4:14 PM
REPLY TO33 Response to Motion (2255) filed by Ronnie Lee Hoof. (2 pages) (REK) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Sealed Document
Thu 06/01 10:34 AM
Sealed Exhibit D to33 Limited Response to Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by USA. (CR-05-455-PHX-ROS) (MAP) |
|
36 | 36
order
Order on Motion to Seal Document
Thu 06/01 10:30 AM
ORDER granting34 Motion to Seal. ORDERED that Respondent's Proposed Exhibit D, (Lodged Doc.35 ) shall be FILED UNDER SEAL. FURTHER ORDERED that Movant shall have through July 3, 2017 to reply in support of the Motion to Vacate (Doc.1 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 5/31/17.(MAP) (CR-05-455-PHX-ROS) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
respoth
Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)
Tue 05/23 4:46 PM
SEALED LODGED Proposed Exhibit D to the Government's Limited Response to Defendant's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence Under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 re:34 MOTION to Seal Document Exhibit D to the Government's Limited Response to Defendant's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence Under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by USA. (Simon, Thomas) |
|
34 | 34
motion
Seal Document
Tue 05/23 4:40 PM
MOTION to Seal Document Exhibit D to the Government's Limited Response to Defendant's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence Under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 by USA.(Simon, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
33 | 33
misc
Response to Motion (2255)
Tue 05/23 4:29 PM
RESPONSE TO1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) . filed by USA.(Simon, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit F | ||
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order
Wed 05/10 3:42 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that all motions to amend, motions to supplement, motions to stay, motions for evidentiary hearing, motions to expand the record, and the like, seeking to expand the Motion to Vacate, or the record herein, shall be filed within twenty-eight (28) days of the service of Respondents' response to the Motion to Vacate; any reply in support of the Motion to Vacate must be filed within thirty-five (35) days of the service of Respondents response to the Motion to Vacate; all exhibits to the response shall be individually and serially labeled; electronically filed exhibits shall be electronically filed in the same order as they are denominated; any copies of filings for Magistrate Judge Metcalf provided pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.4 shall be forwarded c/o Office of Clerk of Court, U.S. District Court District of Arizona, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, AZ 85003. See document for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 5/10/2017. (REK) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Affidavit
Tue 05/09 3:59 PM
AFFIDAVIT of of Truth in Support of:1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by Petitioner Ronnie Lee Hoof. (2 pages and envelope) (REK) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Change of Address (Party)
Tue 05/09 3:53 PM
NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Ronnie Lee Hoof: #84053-008, FCI Safford, P.O. Box 9000, Safford, AZ 85548. (2 pages and envelope) (REK) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 04/03 5:30 PM
First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ronnie Lee Hoof.(Behm, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order | ||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 04/04 11:40 AM
ORDER - Counsel's28 Ex Parte Motion for Determination of Counsel is granted. Mr. Douglas Behm is relieved of any further responsibility in this matter. Counsel's24 Motion to Seal is granted. The as-lodged Ex Parte Motion for Determination (Doc.25 ) must be filed by the Clerk of Court under seal. This Order must be filed by the Clerk of Court under seal. The Clerk of Court is directed to provide a copy of this Order to Movant and Mr. Douglas Behm only. This Order must not be provided to any other party. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 3/31/2017. (cc: Ronnie Lee Hoof/Douglas Behm) (ATD) |
|
28 | 28
motion
Withdraw as Attorney (Sealed)
Tue 04/04 11:34 AM
SEALED EX PARTE MOTION for Enlargement of Time to File Amended 28 U.S.C. 2255 Petition (Third Request) and REQUEST for Determination of Counsel by Ronnie Lee Hoof. (ATD) |
|
26 | 26
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 03/31 3:14 PM
ORDER that the Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the § 2255 Motion (Doc.1 in CV 16-01723 PHX-ROS (JFM)) and this Order on the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona. The parties and the Clerk of Court must file all documents related to the § 2255 Motion in the civil case. The United States Attorney for the District of Arizona or his designee has 60 days from the date of service within which to answer the § 2255 Motion. Movant may file a reply within 30 days from the date of service of the answer to the § 2255 Motion. The matter is referred to Magistrate Judge James F. Metcalf pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 3/31/17. (KGM) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
respoth
Lodged Proposed Document
Tue 02/07 3:39 PM
SEALED LODGED Proposed Ex Parte Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Amended 28 U.S.C. § 2255 Petition and Request for Determination of Counsel re:24 First MOTION to Seal Document . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Ronnie Lee Hoof.(Behm, Douglas) *Modified on 2/7/2017 to Seal Document Pursuant to Doc.24 (MAP) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
24 | 24
motion
Seal Document
Tue 02/07 3:33 PM
EX PARTE First MOTION to Seal Document by Ronnie Lee Hoof.(Behm, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Fri 01/27 5:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas F Behm on behalf of Ronnie Lee Hoof. (Behm, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion to Seal Document Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 01/11 2:39 PM
*SEALED ORDER granting15 Motion to Seal. FURTHER ORDERED granting21 Ex Parte Motion for Determination of Counsel. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 1/11/17. (CR-05-455-PHX-ROS) (cc: Movant/Hull)(MAP) *Modified on 1/11/2017 to correct distribution (MAP) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Miscellaneous Relief (Sealed)
Wed 01/11 2:35 PM
SEALED EX PARTE MOTION for Determination of Counsel by Ronnie Lee Hoof. (MAP) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 01/11 11:15 AM
ORDER: Movant's Motion to Withdraw Counsel (Doc.18 ) is granted. Ms. Barbara L. Hull, Esq. is relieved of any further responsibility in this matter. Movant's Motion to Proceed Pro Se (Doc.19 ) is denied. Mr. Douglas F. Behm is appointed as counsel of record for Movant pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3006A(a)(2)(B) and the CJA plan for this District. Movant's Motion for Extension of Time (Doc.14 ) is granted. Within 30 days of the date of this Order, Mr. Behm must file a Notice of Appearance in this matter, as well as either an amended motion under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 or a notice informing the Court that counsel does not intend to amend the § 2255 Motion. The parties and the Clerk of Court must file all documents related to the § 2255 Motion in the civil case. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 1/11/17.(EJA) |
|
Monday, November 14, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 11/15 9:45 AM
MOTION for Pro Se Representation by Ronnie Lee Hoof (1 page). (KGM) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 11/15 9:43 AM
MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Barbara L Hull by Ronnie Lee Hoof (1 page). (KGM) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 11/15 9:41 AM
NOTICE re: Mail Complications by Ronnie Lee Hoof (1 page). (KGM) |
|
Tuesday, October 25, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
respoth
Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)
Tue 10/25 1:02 PM
SEALED LODGED Proposed Motion for Determination of Counsel. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Ronnie Lee Hoof. (Hull, Barbara) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Seal Document
Tue 10/25 1:01 PM
EX PARTE MOTION to Seal Document by Ronnie Lee Hoof.(Hull, Barbara) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 09/30 9:28 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time Extension of Time by Ronnie Lee Hoof.(Hull, Barbara) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Fri 09/30 9:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Lynn Hull on behalf of Ronnie Lee Hoof. (Hull, Barbara) |
|
Wednesday, August 31, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 08/31 2:30 PM
ORDER - (1) The Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (Doc.11 ) is granted. Assistant Federal Public Defender Ryan Moore is relieved of his responsibilities in this matter. (2) Ms. Barbara L. Hull is appointed as counsel of record for Movant pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3006A(a)(2)(B) and the CJA plan for this District. (3) Movant's Motion for Extension of Time (Doc.6 ) is granted. Within 30 days of the date of this Order, Ms. Hull must file a Notice of Appearance in this matter, as well as either an amended motion under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 or a notice informing the Court that counsel does not intend to amend the § 2255 Motion. (4) The parties and the Clerk of Court must file all documents related to the § 2255 Motion in the civil case. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 8/31/16. (LAD) |
|
Thursday, August 11, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 08/11 5:10 PM
First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ronnie Lee Hoof.(Moore, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Appointing Counsel | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Thu 08/11 5:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Moore on behalf of Ronnie Lee Hoof. (Moore, Ryan) |
|
Monday, August 08, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 08/09 3:42 PM
NOTICE re: Appointment of Cousel by Ronnie Lee Hoof. (1 page)(KMG) |
|
Monday, August 01, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 08/01 3:10 PM
ORDER this case be reassigned, by lot, to another Magistrate Judge in the District of Arizona. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter has been reassigned by random lot to the Honorable James F. Metcalf. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV 16-01723 PHX-ROS (JFM). Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 8/1/2016. (KMG) |
|
Monday, July 25, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order
Mon 07/25 8:59 AM
ORDER - Within 10 days of the date of this Order, the assigned AFPD (Ryan Moore) shall file a Response to Movant's Notice (Doc.5 ) and Motion (Doc.6 ), and, if appropriate, shall also file a Motion to Withdraw as Counsel in compliance with the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. If the assigned AFPD files a Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, he must also indicate therein what efforts, if any, have been taken to locate substitute counsel for this matter. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 7/22/16. (EJA) |
|
Thursday, June 30, 2016 | ||
notice
Notice of Request for E-Notices
Thu 06/30 10:56 AM
NOTICE of request for e-notices by Keith J. Hilzendeger. (Hilzendeger, Keith) |
||
Friday, June 24, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to Amend
Mon 06/27 11:13 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Petition by Ronnie Lee Hoof (2 pages). (KGM) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 06/27 11:11 AM
NOTICE re: Appointment of Counsel by Ronnie Lee Hoof (3 pages). (KGM) |
|
Tuesday, June 14, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 06/14 1:34 PM
NOTICE re: Appointment of Counsel by Ronnie Lee Hoof re:3 Order . (Moore, Ryan) |
|
Thursday, June 09, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Thu 06/09 2:44 PM
ORDER The Federal Public Defender for the District of Arizona, or his designee, must assign an Assistant Federal Public Defender to represent Movant in this matter, and the assigned Assistant Federal Public Defender must file a notice of appearance within 10 days from the filing date of this Order. Movant's counsel is granted 30 days from the filing date of this Order in which to file either an amended motion under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 or a notice informing the Court that counsel does not intend to amend the § 2255 Motion. The parties and the Clerk of Court must file all documents related to the § 2255 Motion in the civil case. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 6/9/2016. (KMG) |
|
Tuesday, May 31, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment
Wed 06/01 4:38 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (HLA) |
|
1 | 1
mot2255
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Wed 06/01 4:37 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) re: Criminal Case No CR-05-455-PHX-ROS-1 filed by Ronnie Lee Hoof. (12 pages)(HLA) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |