Washington Western District Court
Judge:John C Coughenour
Case #: 2:16-cv-00809
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Case Filed:Jun 01, 2016
Terminated:Aug 25, 2016
Last checked: Monday Nov 28, 2016 12:59 AM PST
Defendant
Does 1-10
Represented By
Joyce A Roper
contact info
Bruce L Turcott
contact info
Sierra M. McWilliams
Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Governor Jay Inslee
Represented By
Joyce A Roper
contact info
Bruce L Turcott
contact info
Sierra M. McWilliams
Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
John Wiesman, DrPH, MP
Represented By
Joyce A Roper
contact info
Bruce L Turcott
contact info
Sierra M. McWilliams
Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Bob Ferguson
Represented By
Joyce A Roper
contact info
Bruce L Turcott
contact info
Sierra M. McWilliams
Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Rick Garza
Represented By
Joyce A Roper
contact info
Bruce L Turcott
contact info
Sierra M. McWilliams
Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Jay Inslee
P.O. Box 40002
Olympia, WA 98504
Defendant
John Wiesman
PO Box 47890
Olympia, WA 98504
Plaintiff
Dr Gregory Carter, MD
119 1st Avenue S. Ste 260 Seattle
Seattle, WA 98104
Represented By
Douglas Hiatt
contact info
Plaintiff
Meagan Holt
119 1st Avenue S. Ste 260 Seattle
Seattle, WA 98104
Represented By
Douglas Hiatt
contact info
Plaintiff
Dr. Gregory T Carter
119 1st Avenue S. Ste 260 Seattle
Seattle, WA 98104
Represented By
Douglas Hiatt
contact info
Plaintiff
Eric Mevis
Represented By
Douglas Hiatt
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/26/2017 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, December 29, 2016
32 32 appeal Mandate of USCA Thu 3:44 PM
MANDATE of USCA 16-35762 as to30 Notice of Appeal, filed by Meagan Holt, Eric Mevis, Gregory Carter, MD. Pursuant to the stipulation (Docket Entry No. 15) under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b) by appellant and appellees, it is ordered that appeal No. 16-35762 be dismissed. Costs shall be allocated pursuant to the stipulation. A copy of this order shall act as and for the mandate of this court. (SG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2016
31 31 appeal Time Schedule Order Wed 2:51 PM
TIME SCHEDULE ORDER 16-35762 as to30 Notice of Appeal, filed by Meagan Holt, Eric Mevis, Gregory Carter, MD : Appellants optional reply brief due within 14 days of service of the response brief. (RE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2016
30 30 appeal Notice of Appeal to Circuit Tue 2:21 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit re28 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,29 Judgment by Court by Plaintiffs Gregory Carter, MD, Meagan Holt, Eric Mevis. Filing Fee $505, Receipt number 0981-4607540. (Hiatt, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2016
29 29 order Judgment by Court Fri 7:32 AM
JUDGMENT BY COURT; The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and failure to state a claim20 . Case is dismissed case with prejudice. (PM)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 7:28 AM
ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour granting Defendants'20 Motion to Dismiss under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) for failure to state a claim on which relief may by granted. Case is dismissed with prejudice. (PM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2016
27 27 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Wed 3:35 PM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Defendants Does 1-10, Bob Ferguson, Rick Garza, Jay Inslee, John Wiesman, DrPH, MP(Roper, Joyce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement
Friday, July 15, 2016
26 26 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 7:40 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendants Does 1-10, Bob Ferguson, Rick Garza, Jay Inslee, John Wiesman, DrPH, MP, TO RESPONSE to20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION (McWilliams, Sierra)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2016
25 25 respm Declaration Mon 11:17 PM
DECLARATION of MEAGAN HOLT filed by Plaintiffs Gregory Carter, MD, Meagan Holt, Eric Mevis re20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION(Hiatt, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
24 24 respm Response to Motion Mon 11:11 PM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Gregory Carter, MD, Meagan Holt, Eric Mevis, to20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION . Oral Argument Requested. (Hiatt, Douglas)
Related: [-]
23 23 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 8:40 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against defendant(s) All Defendants, filed by Gregory Carter, MD, Eric Mevis.(Hiatt, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2016
22 22 order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Thu 10:58 AM
ORDER denying plaintiffs'7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2016
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 7:07 PM
REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Gregory Carter, MD, Eric Mevis, TO RESPONSE to7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction TO DECLARE INVALID AND ENJOIN ENFORCEMENT OF SB 5052(Hiatt, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit DECLARATION OF JOHN NOVAK IN SUPPORT OF REPLY MOTION,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Monday, June 20, 2016
20 20 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 7:05 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Defendants Does 1-10, Bob Ferguson, Rick Garza, Jay Inslee, John Wiesman, DrPH, MP. Noting Date 7/15/2016, (Roper, Joyce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
19 19 misc Affidavit of Service (non-process) Mon 6:46 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Defendants Does 1-10, Bob Ferguson, Rick Garza, Jay Inslee, John Wiesman, DrPH, MP re18 Response to Motion, (Roper, Joyce)
Related: [-]
18 18 respm Response to Motion Mon 6:15 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendants Does 1-10, Bob Ferguson, Rick Garza, Jay Inslee, John Wiesman, DrPH, MP, to7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction TO DECLARE INVALID AND ENJOIN ENFORCEMENT OF SB 5052 .(Roper, Joyce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit
Wednesday, June 15, 2016
17 17 order Discovery and Depositions Order (form) Wed 7:59 AM
ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc JCC-Set Status Conference Wed 7:57 AM
MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. The nature of the case; 2. The status of matters which are presently set before the Court, e.g., hearings, motions, etc.; 3. The status of discovery and a time schedule for its completion; 4. A statement of any legal issues about which motions are contemplated and a possible briefing schedule; 5. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 6. Whether the case is jury or non-jury; 7. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 8. Settlement probabilities; and 9. Whether the parties consent to proceed to trial before an assigned magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, arrangements may be made to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) days prior to the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 10/4/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2016
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Tue 12:04 PM
Attorneys Bruce L Turcott and Sierra M. McWilliams for defendants Does 1-10, Bob Ferguson, Rick Garza, Jay Inslee, John Wiesman, DrPH, MP added; per15 Notice of Appearance. (CDA)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2016
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joyce A Roper on behalf of Defendants Does 1-10, Bob Ferguson, Rick Garza, Jay Inslee, John Wiesman, DrPH, MP. (Roper, Joyce)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2016
14 14 service Certificate of Service Fri 4:34 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Gregory Carter, MD, Eric Mevis re10 Declaration,9 Declaration,1 Complaint,2 Civil Cover Sheet,7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction TO DECLARE INVALID AND ENJOIN ENFORCEMENT OF SB 5052 ,8 Declaration (Hiatt, Douglas)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 4:21 PM
SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Bob Ferguson on 6/2/2016; Rick Garza on 6/2/2016; Jay Inslee on 6/2/2016; John Wiesman, DrPH, MP on 6/2/2016(Hiatt, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Defendant RickGarza,
Att: 2 Summons Defendant Bob Ferguson,
Att: 3 Summons Defendant John Wiesman
Thursday, June 02, 2016
12 12 service Summons Issued Thu 1:00 PM
Summons electronically issued as to defendant(s) Bob Ferguson, Rick Garza, Jay Inslee, John Wiesman, DrPH, MP.(ST)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 12:52 PM
**DISREGARD** Magistrate Judge Mary Alice Theiler added. (ST) Modified on 6/2/2016. Case reassigned to Judge John C. Coughenour. (ST)
Related: [-]
utility Notice to Filer Thu 1:03 PM
NOTICE TO FILER: Upon case opening, the filer is responsible for entering party text exactly as it appears on the complaint. For example, " Washington State Attorney General, in his own capacity " should have been added as party text for Bob Ferguson . If you have questions about party text, please refer to the Attorney's Guide to Opening a Civil Case on the court's website. The docket has now been corrected. Thank you. (ST)
Related: [-]
utility Notice to Filer Thu 1:05 PM
NOTICE TO FILER: When opening a new case, do not add party or attorney addresses, phone numbers, email addresses, etc., unless the party will be appearing pro se. The docket has been corrected. Thank you. (ST)
Related: [-]
utility Notice to Filer Thu 1:05 PM
NOTICE TO FILER: In the future, the Civil Cover Sheet and Summons(es) must be attached to the complaint upon case opening. Please refer to the Attorneys' Guide to Opening a Civil Case on the court's website if you have any questions. Thank you. (ST)
Related: [-]
utility Notice to Filer Thu 1:09 PM
NOTICE TO FILER: Although the plaintiff included a jury demand on the complaint pursuant to LCR 38(b), the proper field was not chosen by the filer in the case data screen upon case opening. The docket has been updated. (ST)
Related: [-]
utility Notice to Filer Thu 1:11 PM
NOTICE TO FILER: In the future, please enter all parties on the docket as they are listed on the complaint. The filer neglected to enter defendant(s) Does 1-10 when the case was opened. The missing party has now been added to the docket. Thank you. (ST)
Related: [-]
utility Notice to Filer Thu 1:13 PM
NOTICE TO FILER: In the future, do not put a date on the summons form when opening a new case. The Clerk will enter the date on which the summonses are issued. Thank you. (ST)
Related: [-]
utility Notice to Filer Thu 1:15 PM
NOTICE TO FILER: Due to the number of errors made during the case opening process and the time spent correcting those errors, the filer is directed to review the case opening instructions before filing another case in this court. The instructions can be found on the court's website at wawd.uscourts.gov . Thank you. (ST)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 1:50 PM
U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (ST)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2016
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Douglas Hiatt on behalf of Plaintiffs Gregory T Carter, Eric Mevis. (Hiatt, Douglas)
Related: [-]
10 10 respm Declaration Wed 9:53 PM
DECLARATION of Douglas Hiatt filed by Plaintiffs Gregory T Carter, Eric Mevis re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction TO DECLARE INVALID AND ENJOIN ENFORCEMENT OF SB 5052(Hiatt, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C
9 9 respm Declaration Wed 9:50 PM
DECLARATION of ERIC MEVIS filed by Plaintiffs Gregory T Carter, Eric Mevis re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction TO DECLARE INVALID AND ENJOIN ENFORCEMENT OF SB 5052 (Hiatt, Douglas)
Related: [-]
8 8 respm Declaration Wed 9:48 PM
DECLARATION of GREGORY CARTER filed by Plaintiffs Gregory T Carter, Eric Mevis re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction TO DECLARE INVALID AND ENJOIN ENFORCEMENT OF SB 5052(Hiatt, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
7 7 motion Preliminary Injunction Wed 9:33 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction TO DECLARE INVALID AND ENJOIN ENFORCEMENT OF SB 5052 by Plaintiffs Gregory T Carter, Eric Mevis. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 6/24/2016, (Hiatt, Douglas)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Praecipe for a Summons Wed 7:54 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS FOR RICK GARZA by Plaintiffs Gregory T Carter, Eric Mevis (Hiatt, Douglas)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Praecipe for a Summons Wed 7:52 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS FOR GOVERNOR JAY INSLEE by Plaintiffs Gregory T Carter, Eric Mevis (Hiatt, Douglas)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Praecipe for a Summons Wed 7:50 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS FOR JOHN WIESMAN by Plaintiffs Gregory T Carter, Eric Mevis (Hiatt, Douglas)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Praecipe for a Summons Wed 7:48 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS FOR BOB FERGUSON by Plaintiffs Gregory T Carter, Eric Mevis (Hiatt, Douglas)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 7:37 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff Eric Mevis. (Hiatt, Douglas)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 7:27 PM
COMPLAINT TO DECLARE INVALID AND ENJOIN ENFORCEMENT OF SB 5052 against All Defendants Related [+] Attorney Douglas Hiatt added to party Gregory T Carter(pty:pla), filed by Gregory T Carter, Eric Mevis.(Hiatt, Douglas)
Related: [-] ceipt # 0981-4471569