Smith v. Physician Reliance LLC
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam A Lindsay |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-01480 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jun 02, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 05, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 29, 2016 3:46 AM CST |
Defendant
Physician Reliance LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Guadalupe Smith
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 29 minutes ago |
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation
Thu 06/01 4:59 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice by Physician Reliance LLC. (Tall, Vicki) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Fri 05/05 4:39 PM
Order Administratively Closing Case. The court has been notified by the mediator, Courtenay L. Bass, that this case has settled. The parties are therefore directed to file a stipulation or notice of dismissal, or agreed motion to dismiss with the United States District Clerk's Office by 6/5/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/5/2017) (axm) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
adr
ADR Summary
Thu 05/04 4:22 PM
Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by ADR Provider. Attorneys in Attendance: John Wall, Kolter McKenzie, Vicki Tall. Prv Fee: $ 3050.00. Outcome of ADR: Settled as a result of ADR. (Bass, Courtenay) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Fri 03/31 9:42 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting16 Motion to Substitute Attorney. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 3/31/2017) (chmb) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Substitute Attorney
Thu 03/30 4:41 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney, added attorney Vicki D Tall,Vicki D Tall for Physician Reliance LLC. Motion filed by Physician Reliance LLCAttorney Vicki D Tall added to party Physician Reliance LLC(pty:dft) (Tall, Vicki) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15
trial
Designation of Experts
Thu 03/30 4:11 PM
Designation of Experts by Physician Reliance LLC. (Tall, Vicki) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
trial
Designation of Experts
Mon 03/06 12:15 PM
Designation of Experts by Guadalupe Smith. (Wall, John) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Status Report
Wed 01/04 8:49 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Settlement Negotiations filed by Physician Reliance LLC. (Tall, Vicki) |
|
Thursday, October 06, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order For ADR
Thu 10/06 5:28 PM
MEDIATION ORDER. The parties are to select or designate a mediator. The[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] is available electronically. Deadline for mediation is on or before 6/2/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 10/6/2016) (ash) |
|
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 10/06 5:20 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on 10/2/2017 before Judge Sam A Lindsay. Joinder of parties and amended pleadings due by 1/4/2017. Dispositive motions due by 6/16/2017. Discovery due by 6/2/2017. Pretrial materials and pretrial order due by 9/5/2017. Settlement status report due by 1/4/2017. Pretrial conference will be held on 9/29/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 10/6/2016) (ash) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order
Thu 09/29 4:28 PM
Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Guadalupe Smith. (Wall, John) |
|
Wednesday, August 31, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Status Report Order
Wed 08/31 12:15 PM
ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND STATUS REPORT: In accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and 26(f), counsel and any unrepresented party are directed to confer. This conference shall take place no later than 9/15/2016. Status Report due by 9/30/2016. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 8/31/2016) (ykp) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 08/31 12:16 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Wed Aug 31 12:16:43 CDT 2016 (crt) |
||
Monday, July 11, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/11 5:01 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Physician Reliance LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate McKesson Corporation for Physician Reliance LLC. (Snyder, Kristin) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 07/11 3:48 PM
ANSWER to6 Amended Complaint,, filed by Physician Reliance LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Kristin Michelle Snyder added to party Physician Reliance LLC(pty:dft) (Snyder, Kristin) |
|
Tuesday, June 28, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 06/28 3:50 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Physician Reliance LLC filed by Guadalupe Smith. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Wall, John) |
|
Tuesday, June 14, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned
Wed 06/15 9:03 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Physician Reliance LLC; served on 6/7/2016. (ykp) |
|
Thursday, June 02, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/02 2:59 PM
Summons Issued as to Physician Reliance LLC. (mem) |
|
3 | 3
qcref
Lindsay
Thu 06/02 2:57 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mem) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/02 2:09 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Guadalupe Smith. (Wall, John) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/02 2:07 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Guadalupe Smith. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-7622026) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Wall, John) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |