Guan v. Coven et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Alvin K Hellerstein |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-04115 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Jun 02, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 27, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 29, 2016 4:17 AM EST |
Defendant
James B Comey
Federal Bureau of Investigation 935 Pennsylvania Ave NW
Washington, DC 20535 |
|
Defendant
DIRECTOR Phyllis Coven
NYC USCIS DIRECTOR ROOM 11-1104 26 FEDERAL PLAZA
NEW YORK, NY 10278 |
|
Defendant
Secretary Jeh Johnson
US Department of Homeland Security 245 Murray Lane, S.W.
Washington, DC 20528 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Loretta E. Lynch
U.S. Department of Justice U.S. Attorney General 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20530 |
|
Defendant
Director David Roark
U.S. CIS Texas Service Center USCIS Texas Service Center 4141 North St. Augustine Rd.
Dallas, TX 75227 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Director Leon Rodriguez
U.S. Citizenship of Homeland Security USCIS Headquarters 425 I Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20536 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Director James B Comey
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation 935 Pennsylvania Ave NW
Washington, DC 20535 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
FieldOffice Directo Phyllis Coven
U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services New York City District Office NYC USCIS DIRECTOR ROOM 11-1104 26 FEDERAL PLAZA
NEW YORK, NY 10278 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Attorney Genera Loretta E. Lynch
U.S. Department of Justice U.S. Department of Justice U.S. Attorney General 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20530 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yu Ying Guan
104 62 38th Avenue, 2nd Floor
Corona, NY 11368 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 27, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Stipulation and Order
Thu 10/27 12:35 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, that this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs or fees to any party. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/27/2016) (cla) |
|
Wednesday, October 19, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 10/19 3:30 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nelsy De La Nuez on behalf of James B Comey, Phyllis Coven, Jeh Johnson, Loretta E. Lynch, David Roark, Leon Rodriguez. (De La Nuez, Nelsy) |
|
Tuesday, August 16, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Tue 08/16 11:01 AM
NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Case Management and Scheduling Conference Pursuant to Rule 16 of the F.R.C.P. set for 11/18/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. It is Ordered that counsel to whom this Order is sent is responsible for faxing a copy to all counsel and retaining verification of such in the case file. Do not fax such verification to Chambers. Please include telephone numbers and fax numbers on all documents submitted to the Court. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/16/2016) (tro) |
|
Monday, August 15, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 08/15 4:57 PM
ORDER granting4 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants The motion is granted and time to Answer is enlarged to November 6, 2016. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein)(Text Only Order) (Hellerstein, Alvin) |
|
Monday, August 08, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 08/08 1:24 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Bryan Lonegan dated August 8, 2016. Document filed by James B Comey, Phyllis Coven, Jeh Johnson, Loretta E. Lynch, David Roark, Leon Rodriguez.(Lonegan, Bryan) |
|
Wednesday, June 22, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/22 3:10 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bryan Keith Lonegan on behalf of James B Comey, Phyllis Coven, Jeh Johnson, Loretta E. Lynch, David Roark, Leon Rodriguez. (Lonegan, Bryan) |
|
Friday, June 03, 2016 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Fri 06/03 11:59 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Aileen Shao. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: James B Comey, Phyllis Coven, Jeh Johnson, Loretta E. Lynch, David Roark, Leon Rodriguez. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (dgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 06/03 12:03 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (dgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 06/03 12:05 PM
Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (dgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 06/03 12:05 PM
Case Designated ECF. (dgo) |
||
Thursday, June 02, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 06/02 3:08 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Shao, Aileen) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus
Thu 06/02 3:07 PM
COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against James B Comey, Phyllis Coven, Jeh Johnson, Loretta E. Lynch, David Roark, Leon Rodriguez (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12372169).Document filed by Yu Ying Guan.(Shao, Aileen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Supporting Document |