Swipe Innovations, LLC v. Pax Technology, Inc. et al
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Ron Clark |
Case #: | 9:13-cv-00016 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jan 16, 2013 |
Terminated: | Jul 29, 2013 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 11, 2015 10:49 PM CST |
Counter Defendant
Swipe Innovations, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Swipe Innovations, LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Counter Claimant
Pax Technology, Inc.
Terminated: 07/29/2013
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hi Sun Technology (China) Ltd.
Terminated: 07/29/2013
|
|
Defendant
PAX Global Technology Ltd.
Terminated: 07/29/2013
|
|
Defendant
Pax Technology, Inc.
Terminated: 07/29/2013
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/25/2013 10:48 PM CST |