Groves v. Louisiana State Police et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sarah S Vance |
Referred: | Joseph C Wilkinson, Jr |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-08504 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 06, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 15, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 03, 2016 3:48 AM CST |
Defendant
Charles Dupuy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael D. Edmonson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeff Landry
Attorney General 1885 North Third Street
Baton Rouge, LA 70802 |
|
Defendant
Louisiana State
|
|
Defendant
Louisiana State Police
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joey Schoueft
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
State of Louisiana
|
|
Petitioner
Mr. audrey lee groves
309 Estate Drive
Houma, LA 70364 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Audrey Lee Groves
|
Represented By
|
Selection Required
Lieutenant-Colonel Charles Dupuy
Louisiana State Police 7919 Independence Blvd.
Baton Rouge, LA 70806 |
|
Selection Required
Colonel Michael D. Edmonson
Louisiana State Police 7919 Independence Blvd.
Baton Rouge, LA 70806 |
|
Selection Required
State of Louisiana Office of the Attorney General
1885 North Third Street
Baton Rouge, LA 70802 |
|
Selection Required
State of Louisiana, through the Office of the Governor, Division of Administration, Office of Risk Management
Division of Administration 1201 North Third Street ste. 7-210
Baton Rouge, LA 70802 |
|
Selection Required
Mr. joey schoueft
Louisiana State Police Troop C 4047 West Park Avenue
Gray, LA 70359 |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
Thu 12/15 4:35 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 12/15/2016. (mmm) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Dismiss Case
Thu 12/15 11:04 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Case by Audrey Lee Groves.(McGovern, Glenn) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 08, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order Terminate Hearings
Thu 12/08 10:12 AM
ORDER - Considering plaintiff's counsel's representation that there is an agreement to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, the PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE set for December 8, 2016 is continued without date. Counsel was informed to download the consent form from the Court's website and return the completed form the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wilkinson for signature.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 12/8/16. (NEF Mag2)(jjs) |
|
Thursday, November 03, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order Set Hearings
Thu 11/03 11:17 AM
ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 12/8/2016 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/3/16.(jjs) |
|
Tuesday, September 20, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Tue 09/20 1:37 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Audrey Lee Groves re14 Order, (McGovern, Glenn) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order
Tue 09/20 11:31 AM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff show good cause in writing within 20 days why the defendant should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal in accordance with Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 9/20/16.(jjs) |
|
Tuesday, September 06, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record
Tue 09/06 2:07 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record. Gregory C. Fahrenholt is enrolled as additional counsel of record in this matter on behalf of defendants Louisiana State Police, Charles Dupuy, Joey Schouest, and Michael D. Edmonson.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 9/6/16. (jjs) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Enroll as Counsel of Record
Tue 09/06 10:18 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Charles Dupuy, Michael D. Edmonson, Louisiana State Police, Joey Schoueft.Attorney Gregory C. Fahrenholt added to party Charles Dupuy(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory C. Fahrenholt added to party Michael D. Edmonson(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory C. Fahrenholt added to party Louisiana State Police(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory C. Fahrenholt added to party Joey Schoueft(pty:dft).(Fahrenholt, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 19, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/19 5:03 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,, with Jury Demand by Charles Dupuy, Michael D. Edmonson, Louisiana State Police, Joey Schoueft.Attorney Celeste Brustowicz added to party Charles Dupuy(pty:dft), Attorney Celeste Brustowicz added to party Michael D. Edmonson(pty:dft), Attorney Celeste Brustowicz added to party Louisiana State Police(pty:dft), Attorney Celeste Brustowicz added to party Joey Schoueft(pty:dft).(Brustowicz, Celeste) |
|
Friday, June 17, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 06/17 3:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; (McGovern, Glenn) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 06/17 3:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Louisiana State served on 6/16/2016, answer due 7/7/2016. (McGovern, Glenn) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 06/17 3:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Charles Dupuy served on 6/16/2016, answer due 7/7/2016. (McGovern, Glenn) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 06/17 3:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Joey Schoueft served on 6/15/2016, answer due 7/6/2016. (McGovern, Glenn) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 06/17 3:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Michael D. Edmonson served on 6/16/2016, answer due 7/7/2016. (McGovern, Glenn) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 06/17 3:16 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Jeff Landry served on 6/16/2016, answer due 7/7/2016. (McGovern, Glenn) |
|
Thursday, June 09, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/09 1:49 PM
Summons Issued as to Charles Dupuy, Michael D. Edmonson, Louisiana State, Joey Schoueft.(mmm) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons | ||
3 | 3
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Thu 06/09 1:44 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re1 Complaint. **ERRORS** Please read carefully and comply fully on future filings. **1. Please be advised that the E-Filing a New Civil Case Guidelines state 'Do not enter address, phone or fax info for any party'. Clerk took corrective action. **2. Please be advised that the Guidelines for Adding Parties state: "DO NOT enter the names in all CAPS or in all lower case". Clerk took correction. **3. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf. For future filings, properly formatted pdf's will not have the green header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. Clerk has taken corrective action. ***IMPORTANT: When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. (mmm) |
|
Wednesday, June 08, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 06/08 8:18 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (mmv) |
|
Monday, June 06, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/06 12:13 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Charles Dupuy, Michael D. Edmonson, State of Louisiana Office of the Attorney General, State of Louisiana, through the Office of the Governor, Division of Administration, Office of Risk Management, joey schoueft (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-5464966) filed by audrey lee groves.Attorney Glenn Charles McGovern added to party audrey lee groves(pty:pet).(McGovern, Glenn) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 9 Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Summons, | ||
Att: 12 Summons, | ||
Att: 13 Summons, | ||
Att: 14 Summons, | ||
Att: 15 Summons, | ||
Att: 16 Summons |