SIENNA TRANSPORTATION FINANCE, LLC v. ASAP FREIGHT SERVICES, INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | William J Martini |
Referred: | Mark Falk |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-03318 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 08, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 12, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 05, 2016 5:11 AM EST |
Defendant
ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
|
|
Defendant
ASAP FREIGHT SERVICES, INC.
|
|
Defendant
G DELGUIDICE
|
|
Defendant
N DELGUIDICE
|
|
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
|
|
Defendant
GERARD DELGUIDICE
|
|
Defendant
NICHOLAS DELGUIDICE
|
|
Plaintiff
SIENNA TRANSPORTATION FINANCE, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, October 12, 2016 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 10/12 9:20 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (gh, ) |
||
Tuesday, October 11, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 10/11 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SIENNA TRANSPORTATION FINANCE, LLC (MOSKOWITZ, KENNETH) |
|
Monday, October 03, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Call for Dismissal
Mon 10/03 11:29 AM
Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 41.1(a). Motion set for 10/17/2016 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. (gh, ) |
|
Monday, August 01, 2016 | ||
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Mon 08/01 3:26 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ASAP Freight Services, Inc., Gerard Delguidice and Nicholas DelGuidice for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (nr, ) |
||
Friday, July 22, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Letter
Fri 07/22 3:26 PM
Letter re8 Request for Default.(MOSKOWITZ, KENNETH) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Konstantin Fedotov | ||
Thursday, July 21, 2016 | ||
qc
QC - Improper Default Request
Thu 07/21 11:29 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Request for Default submitted by Kenneth L. Moskowitz on 7/20/2016 cannot be granted as requested because a more detailed explanation of service is needed. Please file a Certification explaining in more detail the Rules regarding service in Florida. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (nr, ) |
||
Wednesday, July 20, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Request for Default
Wed 07/20 4:28 PM
Request for Default by SIENNA TRANSPORTATION FINANCE, LLC against Defendants.(MOSKOWITZ, KENNETH) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Of Kenneth L. Moskowitz | ||
Friday, July 01, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/01 3:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SIENNA TRANSPORTATION FINANCE, LLC. N DELGUIDICE served on 6/24/2016, answer due 7/15/2016. (MOSKOWITZ, KENNETH) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/01 3:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SIENNA TRANSPORTATION FINANCE, LLC. G DELGUIDICE served on 6/24/2016, answer due 7/15/2016. (MOSKOWITZ, KENNETH) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/01 2:59 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SIENNA TRANSPORTATION FINANCE, LLC. ASAP FREIGHT SERVICES, INC. served on 6/24/2016, answer due 7/15/2016. (MOSKOWITZ, KENNETH) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/01 2:59 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SIENNA TRANSPORTATION FINANCE, LLC. ASAP FREIGHT SERVICES, INC. served on 6/17/2016, answer due 7/8/2016. (MOSKOWITZ, KENNETH) |
|
Thursday, June 09, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/09 11:51 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10, ASAP FREIGHT SERVICES, INC., G DELGUIDICE, N DELGUIDICE, JOHN DOES 1-10 Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Lacey* (in-jl, ) |
|
Wednesday, June 08, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/09 11:46 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by SIENNA TRANSPORTATION FINANCE, LLC. (in-jl, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/09 11:44 AM
COMPLAINT against ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10, ASAP FREIGHT SERVICES, INC., G DELGUIDICE, N DELGUIDICE, JOHN DOES 1-10 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7152596) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SIENNA TRANSPORTATION FINANCE, LLC.(in-jl, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit a-e, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit f-j, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |