Lawrence v. RockTenn C P L L C et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert G James |
Referred: | Karen L Hayes |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-00821 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 10, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 07, 2016 3:54 AM CST |
Defendant
WestRock C P L L C
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WestRock Services Inc
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Q B E Insurance Company
|
|
Intervenor Defendant
Joseph Lawrence
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
WestRock C P L L C
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
WestRock Services Inc
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Q B E Insurance Co
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Lawrence
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
RockTenn C P L L C
Terminated: 07/01/2016
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
56 | 56
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration Order on Motion for Hearing
Tue 07/25 10:47 AM
ORDER denying49 Motion for New Trial, or in the Alternative, for Reconsideration and51 Motion for Trial, or in the Alternative, for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 7/25/2017. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
55 | 55
7
pgs
order
Memorandum Ruling
Tue 07/25 10:45 AM
MEMORANDUM RULING re49 MOTION for New Trial, or in the Alternative, for Reconsideration filed by Joseph Lawrence and51 MOTION for Trial, or in the Alternative, for Reconsideration filed by Q B E Insurance Co. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 7/25/2017. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
54 | 54
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 07/18 10:16 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re49 MOTION for Trial, or in the Alternative,for Reconsideration filed by Joseph Lawrence. (aty,Mestayer, Michael) Modified on 7/18/2017 to modify docket text. (Crick, S) |