Johnson v. Southwest Airlines Co
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane J Boyle |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-01577 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 10, 2016 3:51 AM CST |
Defendant
Southwest Airlines Co
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Correction of Signature Omission
Tue 03/07 10:45 AM
Notice of Correction of Signature Omission, correcting signature omission in37 Stipulation filed by Kevin Johnson. (Verde, Joshua) |
|
39 | 39
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 03/07 8:26 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER denying9 Motion to Dismiss in light of the parties' settlement. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 3/7/2017) (Judge Jane J. Boyle) |
|
38 | 38
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 03/07 8:25 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER denying5 Motion to Dismiss in light of the parties' settlement. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 3/7/2017) (Judge Jane J. Boyle) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 03/07 9:36 AM
Civil Case Terminated per37 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. (ykp) |
||
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
2
pgs
misc
Stipulation
Mon 03/06 5:56 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Kevin Johnson. (Verde, Joshua) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
2
pgs
misc
Supplemental Document
Fri 03/03 3:14 PM
Supplemental Document by Southwest Airlines Co as to9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act ,10 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion . (Arcadi, Ann Marie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) ExxonMobil v. Coleman Opinion | ||
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
2
pgs
misc
Settlement Conference Report
Tue 02/28 1:19 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REPORT filed by Southwest Airlines Co. (Arcadi, Ann Marie) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
order
Order
Fri 02/17 11:20 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Before the Court are Defendant Southwest Airlines Co.'s Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiff's Complaint (doc.5) and Defendant Southwest Airlines Co.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to the Texas Citizen's Participation Act (doc. 9). A hearing (argument only) is scheduled on both motions for March 7, 2017 at 9:30 am in Judge Boyle's courtroom, recently relocated to the 13th floor(Rm 1351), in the Earl Cabell Federal Building, 1100 Commerce, Dallas, Texas 75242. Counsel are directed to confirm their attendance at the hearing by Tuesday, February 21, 2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 2/17/2017) (Judge Jane J. Boyle) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 02/07 4:19 PM
Defendant's Verified Summary filed by Southwest Airlines Co (Arcadi, Ann Marie) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 01/17 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Filing Answers to Court's Interrogatories filed by Kevin Johnson (Verde, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Answers to Interrogatories | ||
Friday, December 16, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
order
Scheduling Order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Fri 12/16 5:07 PM
RULE 16(B) SCHEDULING ORDER and THE COURT'S INTERROGATORIES TO THE PLAINTIFF: Plaintiff shall answer the Court's Interrogatories attached to this Order no later than 1/17/17. On 2/17/17 defendant shall serve on the plaintiff and file with the Court a Verified Summary and on the same date serve on the plaintiff certain copies. Counsel for the parties shall confer in person no later than 2/21/17 and file a settlement report no later than 2/28/17. All discovery, except as provided in this Order, is STAYED. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 12/16/2016) (ash) (Main Document 31 replaced on 12/16/2016) (mem) |
|
30 | 30
order
Status Report Order
Fri 12/16 5:06 PM
***DISREGARD - See Entry 31 for Correct PDF*** RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING ORDER: Report Regarding Settlement due by 2/28/2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 12/16/2016) (mem) Modified text on 12/16/2016 (mem) |
|
Tuesday, October 18, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Tue 10/18 4:26 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Southwest Airlines Co re28 Response/Objection (Arcadi, Ann Marie) |
|
28 | 28
respm
Response/Objection
Tue 10/18 4:24 PM
RESPONSE filed by Southwest Airlines Co re:27 MOTION to Strike25 Reply,26 Appendix in Support MOTION for Leave to File (Arcadi, Ann Marie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 27, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Strike
Tue 09/27 10:26 AM
MOTION to Strike25 Reply,26 Appendix in Support filed by Kevin Johnson with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Verde, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Strike, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Leave to file Sur-Reply | ||
Tuesday, September 20, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Appendix in Support
Tue 09/20 4:35 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Southwest Airlines Co re25 Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Arcadi, Ann Marie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 3, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment 2 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Reply
Tue 09/20 4:31 PM
REPLY filed by Southwest Airlines Co re:5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Arcadi, Ann Marie) |
|
24 | 24
respm
Reply
Tue 09/20 4:05 PM
REPLY filed by Southwest Airlines Co re:9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act (Arcadi, Ann Marie) |
|
Tuesday, September 06, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Response/Objection
Tue 09/06 4:46 PM
RESPONSE filed by Kevin Johnson re:9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act (Verde, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Declaration of Kevin Johnson, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
22 | 22
respm
Appendix in Support
Tue 09/06 4:27 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Kevin Johnson re21 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Verde, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Tue 09/06 4:25 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Kevin Johnson re5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ,20 Response/Objection (Verde, Joshua) |
|
20 | 20
respm
Response/Objection
Tue 09/06 4:22 PM
RESPONSE filed by Kevin Johnson re:5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Verde, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 02, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 09/02 8:18 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kevin Johnson. (Verde, Joshua) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 09/02 8:17 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Armstrong Verde for Martin C. Robson on behalf of Kevin Johnson. (Verde, Joshua) |
|
17 | 17
respm
Response/Objection
Fri 09/02 8:15 AM
RESPONSE filed by Kevin Johnson re:16 Order to Show Cause (Verde, Joshua) |
|
Monday, August 29, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 08/29 2:55 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, in writing, no later than 9/6/2016, as to why he has not obtained local counsel. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 8/29/2016) (sss) |
|
Thursday, August 18, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/18 11:27 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David R. Broderdorf, II. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). The Court hereby GRANTS David R. Broderdorf, II's Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 8/18/2016) (chmb) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/18 11:25 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas E. Reinert, Jr. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). The Court hereby GRANTS Thomas E. Reinert, Jr.'s Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 8/18/2016) (chmb) |
|
Wednesday, August 17, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 08/17 1:04 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney David R. Broderdorf, II (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7803178) filed by Southwest Airlines Co (Arcadi, Ann Marie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice David Broderdorf, II | ||
12 | 12
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 08/17 1:01 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Thomas E. Reinert, Jr. (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7803143) filed by Southwest Airlines Co (Arcadi, Ann Marie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice - Thomas Reinert, Jr. | ||
Monday, August 15, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Appendix in Support
Mon 08/15 9:50 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Southwest Airlines Co re10 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Arcadi, Ann Marie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Mon 08/15 9:47 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Southwest Airlines Co re9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act (Arcadi, Ann Marie) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Mon 08/15 9:45 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act filed by Southwest Airlines Co (Arcadi, Ann Marie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 08/15 8:22 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Southwest Airlines Co. (Arcadi, Ann Marie) |
|
7 | 7
respm
Appendix in Support
Mon 08/15 8:08 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Southwest Airlines Co re6 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Arcadi, Ann Marie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 2 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Mon 08/15 8:03 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Southwest Airlines Co re5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Arcadi, Ann Marie) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss
Mon 08/15 8:01 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Southwest Airlines CoAttorney Ann Marie Arcadi added to party Southwest Airlines Co(pty:dft) (Arcadi, Ann Marie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 01, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 08/01 5:04 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Southwest Airlines Co filed by Kevin Johnson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Verde, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B | ||
Tuesday, July 12, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 07/12 4:13 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Southwest Airlines Co. Waiver sent on 6/14/2016. (Verde, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, June 14, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
qcref
Boyle
Tue 06/14 9:48 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mcrd) |
|
Monday, June 13, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/13 8:33 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Southwest Airlines Co filed by Kevin Johnson. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-7648058) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Verde, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |