Stokes v. City of Dothan, Alabama
Alabama Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Paul C Huck |
Referred: | Terry F Moorer |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00430 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2016 |
Re-opened: | Apr 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 10, 2016 3:10 AM CST |
Defendant
City of Dothan, Alabama
126 North Saint Andrews Street
Dothan, AL 36303 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rickey Stokes
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 04/06 2:27 PM
ORDER: THIS MATTER is before the Court upon the parties'19 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 4/5/2017. Being fully advised, it is hereby ORDERED and ADJUDGED that this matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own fees and costs. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul C. Huck on 4/6/2017. (dmn, ) |
|
20 | 20
utility
Case Reopened
Thu 04/06 2:22 PM
Case reopened pursuant to Court21 Order. (dmn, ) Modified on 4/6/2017 to remove pdf which was attached in error and create link to Doc.21 . NO PDF. (dmn, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 04/05 3:19 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal JOINT by City of Dothan, Alabama. (Holliday, Shannon) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order
Fri 03/17 12:55 PM
ORDER FOR STATUS REPORT: It is hereby ordered that the parties prepare and file a joint status report (not to exceed two pages) concerning the status of this case, including whether a decision has been made by the Circuit Court of Houston County. The status report shall be filed on or before 4/6/2017. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul C. Huck on 3/17/2017. (dmn, ) |
|
Friday, November 04, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 11/04 12:20 PM
ORDER: THIS MATTER is before the Court following a telephonic status conference, held 11/2/2016. The case was previously stayed pending resolution of state court proceedings. For the reasons set forth at the hearing, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this case will be held in abeyance until such time as either of the parties informs the Court that the case requires some action from the Court and needs to be re-opened, or that all matters have been resolved and the case may be permanently closed. The Clerk is directed to administratively CLOSE this case. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul C. Huck on 11/3/2016. (dmn, ) |
|
Wednesday, November 02, 2016 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Fri 11/04 3:11 PM
Minute Entry for telephonic state conference proceedings held before Honorable Judge Paul C. Huck: Telephone Conference held on 11/2/2016 (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Glenda Powers.) (djy, ) |
||
Tuesday, November 01, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 11/01 10:44 AM
NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephone Conference set for 11/2/2016 at 10:00 AM EDT (09:00 AM CDT) before Honorable Judge Paul C. Huck. Counsel for the parties are instructed to take the following steps shortly be{ore the scheduled conference time so that the telephonic conference may begin promptly: 1. Call the Toll-Free Number: 1-888-684-8852. 2. Enter the access code, 4825076, followed by the # sign. 3. Enter the security code, 332010468, followed by the# sign. 4. State your name and enter the conference. For technical assistance, please call 800-526-2655. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul C. Huck on 11/1/2016. Copies furnished to calendar group, AG. (dmn, ) |
|
Monday, October 24, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Status Report
Mon 10/24 5:00 PM
STATUS REPORT by City of Dothan, Alabama.(Holliday, Shannon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Friday, September 23, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion to Stay
Fri 09/23 2:12 PM
ORDER: THIS MATTER is before the Court following a telephonic hearing, held 9/23/2016. For the reasons set forth at the hearing, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff's7 Motion for Leave to Amend is GRANTED and Defendant's pending5 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. Defendant's9 Motion to Stay is GRANTED with certain conditions. Defendant is ORDERED to provide the Court with a status report by 10/24/2016. Other than the status report ordered above, this Matter is STAYED. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul C. Huck on 9/23/2016. (dmn, ) |
|
minutes
Telephone Conference
Fri 09/23 11:34 AM
Minute Entry for telephonic status conference proceedings held before Honorable Judge Paul C. Huck: Telephone Conference held on 9/23/2016 (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (Court Reporter Glenda Powers.) (djy, ) |
||
Monday, September 19, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement
Mon 09/19 4:09 PM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by City of Dothan, Alabama. (Copeland, Lee) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement
Mon 09/19 3:03 PM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Rickey Stokes. (Etheredge, Stephen) |
|
Friday, September 16, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 09/16 2:39 PM
NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING setting a Telephonic Conference to be held on Friday, 9/23/2016 at 10:00 AM (EDT) (09:00 AM CDT) before Honorable Judge Paul C. Huck. Counsel for the parties are instructed to take steps shortly before the scheduled conference time so that the telephonic conference may begin promptly, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul C. Huck on 9/16/2016. Copies furnished to calendar group, AG. (dmn, ) |
|
10 | 10
respoth
Objection
Fri 09/16 9:37 AM
Objection to re9 MOTION to Stay re6 Order, Set Deadlines,, Briefing Schedule and Set Status Conference in Sixty Days filed by Rickey Stokes.(Etheredge, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, September 15, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Stay
Thu 09/15 4:36 PM
MOTION to Stay re6 Order, Set Deadlines,, Briefing Schedule and Set Status Conference in Sixty Days by City of Dothan, Alabama.(Holliday, Shannon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 09/15 2:22 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Rickey Stokes.(Etheredge, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
7 | 7
motion
Amend/Correct
Thu 09/15 2:15 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint by Rickey Stokes. (Etheredge, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, September 06, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 09/06 3:48 PM
ORDER: THIS CAUSE came before the court upon a sua sponte review of the record. The record reflects that on 8/4/2016, Defendant filed a Motion to Dismiss. Accordingly, it is therefore ORDERED and ADJUDGED that On or before 9/20/2016, Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion. Defendant shall have until 9/27/2016, to file a reply if it chooses. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul C. Huck on 9/6/2016. (dmn, ) |
|
Thursday, August 04, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 08/04 4:08 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Dothan, Alabama.(Holliday, Shannon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 1D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 3 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Attorneys
Fri 08/05 9:06 AM
***Attorney Lee Hall Copeland added for City of Dothan, Alabama. (dmn, ) (see Doc.5 for pdf) |
||
Thursday, July 07, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Affidavit of Service
Thu 07/07 4:01 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on City Clerk on 06/30/2016, filed by Rickey Stokes. (Yarbrough, Derek) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 07/07 4:28 PM
Set Answer Deadlines: City of Dothan, Alabama due 7/21/2016. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, ) |
||
Thursday, June 23, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/23 3:00 PM
Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Paul C. Huck and Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer. Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge, Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as referral judge. (dmn, ) |
|
Monday, June 13, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/16 3:37 PM
Summons Issued as to City of Dothan, Alabama and returned to counsel for personal service. (dmn, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/16 3:37 PM
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against City of Dothan, Alabama ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602041447.), filed by Rickey Stokes.(dmn, ) |
|
Att: 1 Filing Fee Receipt |