Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Edmund A Sargus
Referred: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Case #: 2:13-cv-00136
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2013
Last checked: Saturday Jan 10, 2015 9:13 PM EST
Defendant
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
Represented By
C. Craig Woods
Squire Patton Boggs (us)llp
contact info
Damond R Mace
Squire Patton Boggs (us) LLP
contact info
Aaron Todd Brogdon
Squire Patton Boggs (us) LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Vigneron, Sr.
10717 State Route 550
Vincent, OH 45784
Represented By
Jon C Conlin
Cory Watson Crowder & Degaris
contact info
William Franklin Cash, III
Levin Papantonio Thomas Mitchell Et Al
contact info
Ned McWilliams, Jr.
contact info
Michael A London
Douglas & London, PC
contact info

GPO Nov 15 2013
ORDER granting (77) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Joanna Lynn Lowers' Complaint Without Prejudice in case 2:13-md-02433. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 11/15/2013. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD et al. (dh1)
GPO Nov 15 2013
ORDER granting (57) Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice in case 2:13-cv-00340. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 11/15/13. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD et al. (dh1)
GPO Nov 15 2013
ORDER granting (52) Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice in case 2:12-cv-01180. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 11/15/2013. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD et al. (dh1)
GPO Nov 15 2013
ORDER granting (52) Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice in case 2:12-cv-01183. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 11/15/2013. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS-EPD et al. (dh1)
GPO Nov 07 2016
DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ORDER NO. 20. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Related to Cancerphobia Damages and Fear of Developing Other Probable Link Diseases. The Court grants in part and denies in part (4656) Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Cancerphobia Portion of Damages and Fear of Developing Other Probable Link Diseases. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/07/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (dh1)
GPO Nov 07 2016
DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ORDER NO. 21. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Related to Specific Causation. The Court denies (4653) Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Specific Causation. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/07/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (dh1)
GPO Nov 08 2016
ORDER denying 4804 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike DuPont's Supplemental Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/08/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (dh1)
GPO Dec 27 2016
DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ORDER NO. 22, Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Punitive Damages (4655) in case 2:13-md-02433-EAS. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/27/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (Plaintiff Kenneth Vigneron Sr.). (plb)
GPO Dec 27 2016
ge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/27/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (Plaintiff Kenneth Vigneron, Sr.). (plb)DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ORDER NO. 24, Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's Motion to Bifurcate or Alternatively to Issue Limiting Instruction and Allow Introduction of All Evidence of Malice in case 2:13-md-02433-EAS. Signed by Chief Jud
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
198 198 misc Transcript Tue 12:07 PM
Transcript of the Proceedings (Vol 26) held on 01-05-17, before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Darla Coulter, Official, Telephone number 614-719-3245. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 1/31/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/10/2017. (Errett, Denise)
Related: [-]
197 197 misc Transcript Tue 12:03 PM
Transcript of the Proceedings of Jury Trial (Vol 25) held on 01-04-17, before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Darla Coulter, Official, Telephone number 614-719-3245. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 1/31/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/10/2017. (Errett, Denise)
Related: [-]
196 196 misc Transcript Tue 11:58 AM
Transcript of the Proceedings of the Jury Trial (Vol 24) held on 1-3-17, before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Darla Coulter, Official, Telephone number (614) 719-3245. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 1/31/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/10/2017. (Errett, Denise)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2017
195 195 trial Jury Instructions Mon 4:51 PM
FINAL Jury Instructions. (lvw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2017
193 193 trial Jury Verdict Thu 4:06 PM
JURY VERDICT. Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
192 192 minutes Jury Trial - Held Wed 5:19 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Punitive damages phase of trial held on 1/4/2017. Evidence entered. (Court Reporter: Denise Errett) Associated Cases: 2:13-md-02433-EAS, 2:13-cv-00136-EAS-EPD (lvw)
Related: [-]