Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth E Brown
Case #: 1:13-bk-11981
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2013
Claims Deadline:May 02, 2013
Terminated:Sep 30, 2015
Plan Confirmed:Feb 12, 2014

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Tidewater Oil & Gas Company LLC
110 16th St Ste 405
Denver, CO 80202-5206
Represented By
Lee M. Kutner
contact info
Polsinelli, P.C.
contact info
Benjamin H. Shloss
contact info
David M. Miller
contact info
Lisa N. Nobles
contact info
Aaron A Garber
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee, 11
Byron G. Rogers Federal Building 1961 Stout St. Ste. 12-200
Denver, CO 80294
Represented By
Daniel J. Morse
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
999 18th St. Ste. 1551
Denver, CO 80202


Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago
Wednesday, September 30, 2015
200 200 court Close Bankruptcy Case (Chapter 11) Wed 9:45 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (dmu)
Related: [-]