Texas Western District Court
Judge:Robert Pitman
Referred: Jeffrey C Manske
Case #: 6:16-cv-00170
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Case Filed:Jun 15, 2016
Last checked: Monday Dec 12, 2016 2:37 AM CST
Counter Defendant
DEBRA BREWSTER
Represented By
Kerry Vincent O'Brien
O'Brien Law Firm PC
contact info
David Michael Mathews
Sheehy Lovelace & Mayfield, PC
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
Custom Data Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Philip E. McCleery
Sheehy, Lovelace & Mayfield, P.C.
contact info
David Michael Mathews
Sheehy Lovelace & Mayfield, PC
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
JEFFERY A KEAHEY
Represented By
Philip E. McCleery
Sheehy, Lovelace & Mayfield, P.C.
contact info
David Michael Mathews
Sheehy Lovelace & Mayfield, PC
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
MICHAEL N WARDLAW
Represented By
Philip E. McCleery
Sheehy, Lovelace & Mayfield, P.C.
contact info
David Michael Mathews
Sheehy Lovelace & Mayfield, PC
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
William F. Wardlaw
Represented By
Philip E. McCleery
Sheehy, Lovelace & Mayfield, P.C.
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
Wardlaw Claims Service LLC
Represented By
Philip E. McCleery
Sheehy, Lovelace & Mayfield, P.C.
contact info
David Michael Mathews
Sheehy Lovelace & Mayfield, PC
contact info
Defendant
Custom Data Systems, Inc.
2725 Texas Central Pkwy.
Waco, TX 76712
Represented By
Philip E. McCleery
Sheehy, Lovelace & Mayfield, P.C.
contact info
David Michael Mathews
Sheehy Lovelace & Mayfield, PC
contact info
Defendant
JEFFERY A KEAHEY
401 Mount Lookout Rd.
Waco, TX 76708
Represented By
Philip E. McCleery
Sheehy, Lovelace & Mayfield, P.C.
contact info
David Michael Mathews
Sheehy Lovelace & Mayfield, PC
contact info
Defendant
MICHAEL N WARDLAW
2725 Texas Central Pkwy.
Waco, TX 76712
Represented By
Philip E. McCleery
Sheehy, Lovelace & Mayfield, P.C.
contact info
David Michael Mathews
Sheehy Lovelace & Mayfield, PC
contact info
Defendant
William F. Wardlaw
2725 Texas Central Pkwy.
Waco, TX 76712
Represented By
Philip E. McCleery
Sheehy, Lovelace & Mayfield, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Wardlaw Claims Service LLC
2725 Central Texas Pkwy.
Waco, TX 76712
Represented By
Philip E. McCleery
Sheehy, Lovelace & Mayfield, P.C.
contact info
David Michael Mathews
Sheehy Lovelace & Mayfield, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
DEBRA BREWSTER
Represented By
Kerry Vincent O'Brien
O'Brien Law Firm PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, October 18, 2017
79 79 transcript Transcript Filed Wed 5:41 PM
Transcript filed of Proceedings held on September 26, 2017, Proceedings Transcribed: Day 2 Trial. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela J. Andasola, Telephone number: (210)244-5038 pjandasola@comcast.net. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 11/8/2017, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2017, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/16/2018, (Andasola, Pamela)
Related: [-]
78 78 transcript Transcript Filed Wed 5:38 PM
Transcript filed of Proceedings held on September 25, 2017, Proceedings Transcribed: Day 1 Trial. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela J. Andasola, Telephone number: 210-244-5038, pjandasola@comcast.net. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 11/8/2017, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2017, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/16/2018, (Andasola, Pamela)
Related: [-]