Keo Ratha et al v. Phatthana Seafood Co., Ltd. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John F Walter |
Referred: | Alka Sagar |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-04271 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 04, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 12, 2016 12:37 AM PST |
Defendant
Phatthana Seafood Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rubicon Resources, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
S.S. Frozen Food Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wales & Co. Universe LTd.
|
|
Defendant
Wales and Co. Universe Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yem Ban
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sophea Bun
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sem Kosal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nol Nakry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keo Ratha
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sok Sang
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phan Sophea
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Doe Corporations
Terminated: 09/22/2016
|
1. | Federal judge dismisses human trafficking lawsuit against American and Thai seafood companies (seafoodsource.com) |
Submitted Fri 01/05/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |