The Adoni Group, Inc. v. Express Trade Capital, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-11841
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-11841
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary Kay Vyskocil |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-01135 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jun 17, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 05, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Express Trade Capital, Inc.
1410 Broadway Suite 2600
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Adoni Group, Inc.
475 Park Avenue South 18th Floor
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 10/05 3:01 PM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1135 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Nulty, Lynda) |
||
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Wed 10/04 3:44 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Teresa Sadutto-Carley on behalf of Express Trade Capital, Inc.. (Sadutto-Carley, Teresa) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Tue 01/10 4:00 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Pre-Trial Conference filed by Clifford A. Katz on behalf of The Adoni Group, Inc.. (Katz, Clifford) |
|
Tuesday, October 18, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 10/18 5:12 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Scott L. Swanson on behalf of The Adoni Group, Inc.. (Swanson, Scott) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Tue 10/18 4:19 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing filed by Scott L. Swanson on behalf of The Adoni Group, Inc.. (Swanson, Scott) |
|
Monday, August 29, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Mon 08/29 3:21 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Scott L. Swanson on behalf of The Adoni Group, Inc.. (Swanson, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, August 17, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Wed 08/17 2:21 PM
Second Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/18/2016 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (MKV), Answer due by 9/16/2016, (Braithwaite, Kenishia) |
|
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Wed 08/17 10:50 AM
Request for a Second Summons filed by Scott L. Swanson on behalf of The Adoni Group, Inc.. (Swanson, Scott) |
||
Tuesday, August 09, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Letter
Tue 08/09 12:12 PM
Letter Requesting Supplemental Summons pursuant to Rule 7004 Filed by Clifford A. Katz on behalf of The Adoni Group, Inc.. (Katz, Clifford) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Stipulation
Tue 08/09 12:06 PM
Stipulation of Adjournment Filed by Clifford A. Katz on behalf of The Adoni Group, Inc.. (Katz, Clifford) |
|
Thursday, June 23, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Thu 06/23 4:51 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/10/2016 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (MKV), Answer due by 7/25/2016, (Braithwaite, Kenishia) |
|
Friday, June 17, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Fri 06/17 11:50 AM
Adversary case 16-01135 Complaint against Express Trade Capital, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by Clifford A. Katz on behalf of The Adoni Group, Inc.. (Katz, Clifford) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Fri 06/17 11:52 AM
Receipt of Complaint 16-01135 mkv) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11339185. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |