Bill Hall, Jr., Trucking GP, LLC
Texas Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Craig A Gargotta |
Case #: | 5:16-bk-51386 |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jul 18, 2016 |
Claims Deadline: | Oct 17, 2016 |
Dismissed: | Jan 05, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 27, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Bill Hall, Jr., Trucking GP, LLC
9630 Cagnon Rd
San Antonio, TX 78252-2213 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
1. | Bill Hall Jr. Trucking company withdraws Chapter 11 reinstatement (mysanantonio.com) |
Submitted Wed 01/18/2017 | |
2. | Bill Hall Jr. Trucking GP LLC files for bankruptcy after creditors threatened to repossess various assets (expressnews.com) |
Submitted Tue 06/21/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago |
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 01/27 11:13 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (Hernandez, Rachel) |