Kevin Doucette v. United States of America
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Terry J Hatter, Jr |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-04484 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Tue 04/11 3:30 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document15 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Civil Events - select - Other Filings - select Miscellaneous Filings - select Response. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (shb) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Mon 04/10 4:24 PM
GOVERNMENT'S RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL filed by Respondent United States of America (Christensen, Stephanie) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Wed 03/15 10:32 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Petitioner Kevin Doucette. Dismissal is without prejudice.(Mircheff, Brianna) |
|
Att: 1 Consent to Withdraw | ||
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
cs_rasgn
Chief District Judge Transferring Case
Wed 01/11 5:09 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#17-044) approved by Chief Judge Virginia A. Phillips. IT IS ORDERED, with the concurrence of the Case Management and Assignment Committee, that the following cases be reassigned from the calendar of Judge George H. King to the calendar of Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:16-cv-04484 TJH. (rn) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Mon 01/09 2:56 PM
RESPONSE IN SUPPORT GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PETITIONER'S MOTION TO VACATE, SET ASIDE, OR CORRECT SENTENCE UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 2255 filed by Respondent United States of America. (Christensen, Stephanie) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 12/22 11:12 AM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PETITIONER'S MOTION TO VACATE, SET ASIDE, OR CORRECT SENTENCE UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 2255 10 filed by Petitioner Kevin Doucette. (Mircheff, Brianna) |
|
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Wed 12/21 2:54 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PETITIONER'S MOTION TO VACATE, SET ASIDE, OR CORRECT SENTENCE UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 2255 filed by Respondent United States of America. (Christensen, Stephanie) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
For Order
Tue 11/22 11:04 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING GOVERNMENT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS by Judge George H. King denying6 EX PARTE APPLICATION: Accordingly, the Government's Application to stay these proceedings is DENIED. Inasmuch as the original deadline for the filing of the Government's opposition has now expired during the pendency of this Application, we now order the Government to file its opposition to defendant's § 2255 motion by no later than December 21, 2016. Defendant shall file his reply by no later than January 24, 2017. At that time, the court will consider the status of Beckles and determine whether any stay is warranted under circumstances existing at that time. (see document for further details) (bm) |
|
Thursday, November 17, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Thu 11/17 1:57 PM
REPLY GOVERNMENT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY PETITION UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 2255 filed by Respondent United States of America. (Christensen, Stephanie) |
|
Wednesday, November 16, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 11/16 4:19 PM
OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for STAYING PROCEEDINGS RELATED TO DEFENDANT-PETITIONER'S MOTION TO VACATE, SET ASIDE, OR CORRECT SENTENCE UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 2255 PENDING THE SUPREME COURT'S RESOLUTION OF BECKLES v. UNITED STATES, NO. 15-6 filed by Petitioner Kevin Doucette. (Mircheff, Brianna) |
|
Tuesday, November 15, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Order
Tue 11/15 3:25 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for STAYING PROCEEDINGS RELATED TO DEFENDANT-PETITIONER'S MOTION TO VACATE, SET ASIDE, OR CORRECT SENTENCE UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 2255 PENDING THE SUPREME COURT'S RESOLUTION OF BECKLES v. UNITED STATES, NO. 15-8544 GOVERNMENT'S OPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION filed by Respondent United States of America. (Christensen, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, October 19, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 10/19 3:05 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS RE: DEFENDANT'S SECTION 2255 MOTION by Judge George H. King: Before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255, filed on June 21, 2016. The Government shall file any opposition within 30 days hereof. Defendant shall file any reply brief within 30 days thereafter. The Court will take this matter under submission thereafter.1 . (pso) |
|
Wednesday, June 22, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
attorney
Attorney Appearance or Reassignment for the USA
Wed 06/22 2:26 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of Assistant United States Attorney Stephanie S. Christensen on behalf of respondent United States of America. (Attorney Stephanie S Christensen added to party United States of America(pty:res))(Christensen, Stephanie) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Assignment to US District Judge (CV-17) (2241 and 2255) - optional html form
Wed 06/22 12:08 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. King for motion filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (ghap) |
|
Tuesday, June 21, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 06/21 3:40 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Kevin Doucette. (Mircheff, Brianna) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (28:2255) (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 06/21 3:35 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence, Pursuant to 28 USC 2255 in Criminal Case No. 2:09-cr-00217-GHK, filed by Petitioner Kevin Doucette. (Attorney Brianna Fuller Mircheff added to party Kevin Doucette(pty:pet))(Mircheff, Brianna) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-F |