Jane Doe 4 v. Diocese of Sioux Falls
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles N Clevert, Jr |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-00783 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 19, 2016 2:17 AM CST |
Defendant
Diocese of Sioux Falls
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 4
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 21 minutes ago |
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
utility
Terminate Case - Notice Attorneys
Fri 03/17 9:51 AM
Case Terminated (cms) |
||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 03/16 3:21 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Diocese of Sioux Falls. (Heitkamp, Margaret) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Status Report
Tue 02/28 11:05 AM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Jane Doe 4. (Finnegan, Michael) |
|
order
Text Only Order
Tue 02/28 2:46 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER requiring the parties to file dismissal documents on or before 3/17/17. Signed by Judge Charles N Clevert, Jr on 2/28/17. (cc: all counsel)((kwb), C. N. Clevert, Jr.) |
||
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
order
Order Text Only Order
Wed 02/22 10:10 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Charles N Clevert, Jr. requiring the parties on or before 2/28/17 to file a status report regarding progress toward filing settlement documents. (cc: all counsel)(msk) |
||
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 12/06 2:47 PM
ORDER Granting Motion to Proceed Using a Pseudonym4 signed by Judge Charles N Clevert, Jr on 12/6/16. (cc: all counsel) ((cef), C. N. Clevert, Jr.) |
|
Wednesday, August 17, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Reply Brief in Support of Motion
Wed 08/17 1:26 PM
REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Diocese of Sioux Falls re9 MOTION to Dismiss . (LoCoco, Francis) |
|
Wednesday, August 03, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Affidavit
Wed 08/03 12:08 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Michael G. Finnegan .(Finnegan, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Sioux Falls Brief in Support of Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: Plaintiffs Opposition to Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3: 3/19/09 Order | ||
12 | 12
respm
Brief in Opposition to Motion
Wed 08/03 12:04 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by Jane Doe 4 re9 MOTION to Dismiss . (Finnegan, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, August 02, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal)
Tue 08/02 4:41 PM
NOTICE by Diocese of Sioux Falls of Firm Name Change (LoCoco, Francis) |
|
Wednesday, July 13, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Brief in Support of Motion
Wed 07/13 2:29 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by Diocese of Sioux Falls re9 MOTION to Dismiss . (LoCoco, Francis) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Wed 07/13 2:29 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Diocese of Sioux Falls. (LoCoco, Francis) |
|
Monday, July 11, 2016 | ||
order
Text Only Order
Mon 07/11 4:49 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER: Approving Stipulation7 and extending deadline to file a response to the complaint until 7/13/16. (cc: all counsel)((cef), C. N. Clevert, Jr.) |
||
Thursday, July 07, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
utility
Document Sealed
Thu 07/07 1:53 PM
Disclosure Statement Sealed as to Jane Doe 4. (bx) |
|
Wednesday, July 06, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Wed 07/06 1:08 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time by Diocese of Sioux Falls.(Anzelmo, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 07/06 10:49 AM
Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Jane Doe 4. (Finnegan, Michael) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 07/06 11:08 AM
Due to non-consent, case reassigned to Judge Charles N Clevert, Jr. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (mlm) |
||
Tuesday, July 05, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Affidavit
Tue 07/05 5:22 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Michael G. Finnegan .(Finnegan, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Order 5-12-11, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Order 7-7-11, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Order 7-14-11, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Doe 130 case | ||
4 | 4
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 07/05 5:17 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Proceed Using a Pseudonym Pursuant to Civil L.R. 10 by Jane Doe 4. (Finnegan, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/05 2:19 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Jane Doe 4. (Finnegan, Michael) |
|
Thursday, June 23, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/23 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J Anzelmo on behalf of Diocese of Sioux Falls. Attorney(s) appearing: Anthony J. Anzelmo (Anzelmo, Anthony) |
|
Wednesday, June 22, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 06/22 4:11 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Diocese of Sioux Falls from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2016CV003877 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2366165)(LoCoco, Francis) (lls) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Att: 3 (6/22/2016) Civil Cover Sheet | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Wed 06/22 4:38 PM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available on our website; pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (lls) |