Tabor et al v. Adams County, Colorado et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Marcia S Krieger |
Referred: | N Reid Neureiter |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-01587 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2016 |
Terminated: | Nov 19, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 19, 2016 1:39 AM MST |
Defendant
Michael Brown
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Benjamin Clower
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Corizon Health, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cory Engel
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael (I) McIntosh
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Staci Gordon
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cheryl Groothuis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael McIntosh
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Adams County, Colorado
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stephanie Ostrom
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Karen Sturgeon
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mykelann Wise
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle McLean
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ray Tabor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bridget Tabor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheriff Michael McIntosh
|
|
Plaintiff
Estate of Tyler Tabor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
D.T., minor child by and through his legal guardians
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
136 | 136
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict Order on Motion to Enforce
Mon 11/19 12:50 PM
OPINION AND ORDER denying134 Motion for Leave to Restrict ; denying 135 Motion to Enforce by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/19/18. (pglov) Modified on 11/19/2018 to amend document title(pglov, ) |
|
Friday, November 16, 2018 | ||
135 | 135
motion
Enforce
Mon 11/19 8:36 AM
MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement by Plaintiffs Michelle McLean, Bridget Tabor, Ray Tabor. PUBLIC ENTRY FOR133 Restricted Document - Level 1. Text Only Entry. (cthom, ) |
|
134 | 134
motion
Leave to Restrict
Fri 11/16 4:17 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiffs Michelle McLean, Bridget Tabor, Ray Tabor. (Lane, David) |
|
133 | 133
misc
Restricted Doc. - Level 1 - Viewable by Case Participants & Court
Fri 11/16 4:09 PM
RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs Michelle McLean, Bridget Tabor, Ray Tabor..(Lane, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C |