USA v. Zolfaghari et al
California Northern District Court | |
Case #: | 3:16-cr-00259 |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2016 |
Last checked: Thursday Oct 06, 2016 10:12 AM PDT |
Defendant
King Edward Harris, II (2)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Candelaria Dagandan Vazquez (3)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kia Zolfaghari (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
1. | The Pill Makers Next Door: How America's Opioid Crisis Is Spreading (wsj.com) |
Submitted Thu 10/06/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 10/21/2019 9:20 PM PDT |
Tuesday, June 07, 2016 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT as to Kia Zolfaghari (1). (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016) Modified on 6/14/2016 (mjj2S, COURT STAFF). (mjj2S, COURT STAFF). [3:16-mj-70699-MAG] | |
2 | 2 COMPLAINT as to Candelaria Dagandan Vazquez (2). (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016) Modified on 6/14/2016 (mjj2S, COURT STAFF). (mjj2S, COURT STAFF). [3:16-mj-70699-MAG] | |
3 | 3 COMPLAINT as to King Edward Harris, II (3). (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016) Modified on 6/14/2016 (mjj2S, COURT STAFF). (mjj2S, COURT STAFF). [3:16-mj-70699-MAG] | |
Friday, June 10, 2016 | ||
CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016) | ||
7 | 7 2 pgs Order to Unseal Case as to Kia Zolfaghari, Candelaria Dagandan Vazquez, King Edward Harris, II.. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/10/16. (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016) [3:16-mj-70699-MAG] | |
10 | 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Initial Appearance as to Kia Zolfaghari held on 6/10/2016; Gabriela Bischoff, Specially Appearing for Defendant. AUSA Motion to Unseal Entire Case is Granted. Attorney Appointment Hearing/Submit Financial Affidavit set for 6/13/2016 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016) [3:16-mj-70699-MAG] | |
11 | 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Initial Appearance as to Candelaria Dagandan Vazquez held on 6/10/2016; Gabriela Bischoff, Specially Appearing for Defendant. AUSA Motion to Unseal Entire Case is Granted. Attorney Appointment Hearing/Submit Financial Affidavit set for 6/13/2016 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016) [3:16-mj-70699-MAG] | |
12 | 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Initial Appearance as to King Edward Harris, II held on 6/10/2016; Gabriela Bischoff, Specially Appearing for Defendant. AUSA Motion to Unseal Entire Case is Granted. Attorney Appointment Hearing/Submit Financial Affidavit set for 6/13/2016 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016) [3:16-mj-70699-MAG] | |
Monday, June 13, 2016 | ||
8 | 8 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Kia Zolfaghari (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016) [3:16-mj-70699-MAG] | |
9 | 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Candelaria Dagandan Vazquez (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016) [3:16-mj-70699-MAG] | |
13 | 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Detention Hearing, and Attorney Appointment Hearing as to Kia Zolfaghari held on 6/13/2016; Added attorney Harris Bruce Taback for Kia Zolfaghari, nunc pro tunc to 6/10/2016. Court ordered an assessment by Newbridge. Remanded to custody. Detention Hearing set for 6/24/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016) [3:16-mj-70699-MAG] | |
14 | 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Detention Hearing, and Attorney Appointment Hearing as to Candelaria Dagandan Vazquez held on 6/13/2016; Added attorney Mark Stuart Goldrosen for Candelaria Dagandan Vazquez nunc pro tunc to 6/10/2016. Remanded to custody. Detention Hearing set for 6/14/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016) [3:16-mj-70699-MAG] | |
15 | 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Detention Hearing, and Attorney Appointment Hearing as to King Edward Harris, II held on 6/13/2016; Added attorney Adam Penella for King Edward Harris, II, nunc pro tunc to 6/10/2016. Issued Appearance Bond - Surety advisement provided over the phone. Arraignment, Preliminary Examination, and Status Conference set for 6/24/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016) [3:16-mj-70699-MAG] | |
16 | 16 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by King Edward Harris, II (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016) [3:16-mj-70699-MAG] | |
17 | 17 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release and Appearance as to King Edward Harris II: (3) $50,000 Unsecured. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/13/2016. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016) [3:16-mj-70699-MAG] | |
Tuesday, June 14, 2016 | ||
18 | 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Detention Hearing as to Candelaria Dagandan Vazquez held on 6/14/2016; Surety appeared via phone. Issued Appearance Bond. Arraignment, and Preliminary Examination set for 6/28/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016) [3:16-mj-70699-MAG] | |
19 | 19 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Candelaria Dagandan Vazquez (2): $50,000 Unsecured. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/14/2016. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016) [3:16-mj-70699-MAG] | |
20 | 20 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 6/13/2016 as to Kia Zolfaghari. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016) [3:16-mj-70699-MAG] | |
21 | 21 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 6/13/2016 as to Candelaria Dagandan Vazquez. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016) [3:16-mj-70699-MAG] | |
22 | 22 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 6/13/2016 as to King Edward Harris, II. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016) [3:16-mj-70699-MAG] | |
Tuesday, June 21, 2016 | ||
23 | 23 INDICTMENT as to Kia Zolfaghari (1) count(s) 1, 2-4, 5-6, 7, 8, King Edward Harris, II (2) count(s) 1, 2-4, 5-6, Candelaria Dagandan Vazquez (3) count(s) 1, 7. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016) | |
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet |