SSI Liquidation, Inc.
North Carolina Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Benjamin A Kahn |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-80558 |
Case Filed: | Jun 24, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jul 22, 2016 |
Claims Deadline: | Oct 20, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 15, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Southern Season, Inc.
100 Europa Dr Ste 101
Chapel Hill, NC 27517-2310 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Bankruptcy Administrator
William P. Miller
Bankruptcy Administrator 101 South Edgeworth Street
Greensboro, NC 27401 |
|
Creditor Committee
Unsecured Creditors Committee
PO Box 3324
Greensboro, NC 27402 |
Represented By
|
1. | Southern Season files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy, closing 2 stores while its Chapel Hill flagship store remains open (charlotteobserver.com) |
Submitted Mon 06/27/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 06/23/2016 8:00 PM EDT |
Friday, June 24, 2016 | ||
crditcrd
none
Fri 06/24 1:17 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-80558 [misc,volp11] (1717.00). Receipt number 6951704, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Hearing Set (No BNC Notice)
Fri 06/24 4:19 PM
Hearing Set Hearing scheduled 6/28/2016 at 03:00 PM at Courtroom #1, Greensboro. (Hamrick, C.) |
||
1 | 1
413
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 06/24 1:15 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Southern Season, Inc. (Cournoyer, John) |
|
2 | 2
1
pgs
misc
Corporate Resolution
Fri 06/24 1:53 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Debtor Southern Season, Inc.. (Cournoyer, John) |
|
3 | 3
7
pgs
motion
Employ
Fri 06/24 2:08 PM
Application to Employ Richard M. Hutson II, Hutson Law Office, P.A. and John Paul H. Cournoyer, Northen Blue, LLP as Attorneys for the Debtor Filed by Debtor Southern Season, Inc. (Cournoyer, John) |
|
4 | 4
5
pgs
order
Chapter 11 Operating Order
Fri 06/24 2:20 PM
Chapter 11 Operating Order. (Hamrick, C.) |
|
5 | 5
1
pgs
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 06/24 2:25 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Craig D Mills Filed by Creditor SummitBridge National Credit Investments IV LLC. (Mills, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 06/24 2:35 PM
Motion by Christopher P. Schueller to Appear Pro Hac Vice Local Counsel: Craig D. Mills Filed by Creditor SummitBridge National Credit Investments IV LLC (Mills, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Christopher P. Schueller | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Proposed Order | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
7 | 7
motion
Use Cash Collateral
Fri 06/24 2:36 PM
Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Debtor Southern Season, Inc. (Cournoyer, John) |
|
8 | 8
court
Memo to DIP Attorney re: Duties
Fri 06/24 2:37 PM
Memo to Attorney for Debtor in Possession re: Duties (Hamrick, C.) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Pay Employees
Fri 06/24 2:50 PM
Emergency Motion to Pay Employees . Filed by Debtor Southern Season, Inc. (Cournoyer, John) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Assume/Reject
Fri 06/24 2:58 PM
Emergency Motion to Reject with Ocean Boulevard Properties. and Continue Store Closing Sale Filed by Debtor Southern Season, Inc. (Cournoyer, John) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 06/24 3:02 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Richard M. Hutson II Filed by Debtor Southern Season, Inc.. (Hutson, Richard) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Maintain Existing Bank Accounts
Fri 06/24 3:16 PM
Emergency Motion for Authorization to Maintain Existing Bank Accounts . Filed by Debtor Southern Season, Inc. (Cournoyer, John) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Generic Chapter 11 First Day Motions
Fri 06/24 3:18 PM
Generic Chapter 11 First Day Motions to Honor Gift Cards and Approve Continued Use of Pre-Petition Premier Customer Marketing Program Filed by Debtor Southern Season, Inc. (Cournoyer, John) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Continuation of Utility Service
Fri 06/24 3:19 PM
Emergency Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) Filed by Debtor Southern Season, Inc. (Cournoyer, John) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Expedite Hearing
Fri 06/24 3:24 PM
Emergency Motion to Expedite Hearing Filed by Debtor Southern Season, Inc. (Cournoyer, John) |
|
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Expedite Hearing
Fri 06/24 4:17 PM
Order Granting Motion to Expedite Hearing on 6/28/16 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 1, Greensboro . (Hamrick, C.) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 06/24 5:00 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Southern Season, Inc. . (Cournoyer, John) |