Southern Season Acquisition Corporation
North Carolina Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Benjamin A Kahn |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-80559 |
Case Filed: | Jun 24, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Oct 13, 2016 |
Claims Deadline: | Oct 20, 2016 |
Converted: | Sep 19, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 06, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Southern Season Acquisition Corporation
100 Europa Dr Ste 101
Chapel Hill, NC 27517-2310 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Bankruptcy Administrator
William P. Miller
Bankruptcy Administrator 101 South Edgeworth Street
Greensboro, NC 27401 |
|
Trustee
Sara A. Conti
P.O. Box 939
Carrboro, NC 27510 |
Docket last updated: 06/23/2016 8:00 PM EDT |
Friday, June 24, 2016 | ||
crditcrd
none
Fri 06/24 1:24 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-80559 [misc,volp11] (1717.00). Receipt number 6951719, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
4
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 06/24 1:21 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Southern Season Acquisition Corporation (Cournoyer, John) |
|
2 | 2
1
pgs
misc
Corporate Resolution
Fri 06/24 1:55 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Debtor Southern Season Acquisition Corporation. (Cournoyer, John) |
|
3 | 3
5
pgs
order
Chapter 11 Operating Order
Fri 06/24 2:21 PM
Chapter 11 Operating Order. (Hamrick, C.) |
|
4 | 4
court
Memo to DIP Attorney re: Duties
Fri 06/24 2:39 PM
Memo to Attorney for Debtor in Possession re: Duties (Hamrick, C.) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 06/24 3:06 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Richard M. Hutson II Filed by Debtor Southern Season Acquisition Corporation. (Hutson, Richard) |
|
8 | 8
court
Missing Documents Due
Mon 06/27 11:21 AM
Missing Documents Due: 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 7/8/2016. Atty Fee Disclosure Statement due 7/8/2016. List of Equity Security Holders due 7/8/2016. Schedule A/B due 7/8/2016. Schedule D due 7/8/2016. Schedule E/F due 7/8/2016. Schedule G due 7/8/2016. Schedule H due 7/8/2016. Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/8/2016. Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules 7/8/2016. Verification of Creditor Matrix due by 7/8/2016. Creditor Matrix due 7/8/2016. Incomplete Filings due by 7/8/2016. (Hamrick, C.) |