F. LEE BAILEY
Maine Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Peter G Cary |
Case #: | 2:16-bk-20375 |
Case Filed: | Jun 24, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Sep 23, 2016 |
Discharged: | Oct 05, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2017 |
Discharge Objection Deadline: | Oct 04, 2016 |
Debtor
F. LEE BAILEY
38 Blueberry Cv
Yarmouth, ME 04096-6526 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
F. Lee Bailey
38 Blueberry Cv
Yarmouth, ME 04096-6526 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Jeffrey T. Piampiano, Esq.
Drummond Woodsum 84 Marginal Way Suite 600
Portland, ME 04101 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee
537 Congress Street, Suite 300
Portland, ME 04101 |
1. | F. Lee Bailey, Lawyer for O.J. Simpson, Files for Bankruptcy (bloomberg.com) |
Submitted Sat 06/25/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 06/27/2017 9:04 AM EDT |
Friday, June 24, 2016 | ||
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 16-20375 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 3830359. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) | ||
1 | 1 49 pgs Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $ 335 Filed by F. LEE BAILEY. (Molleur, James) | |
2 | 2 Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by F. LEE BAILEY. (Molleur, James) |