The Containership Company (TCC) A/S et al v. Apex Maritime Co., Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew L Carter, Jr |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-04913 |
Nature of Suit | 423 Bankruptcy - Withdrawal 28 USC 157 |
Cause | 28:0157(c)(1) Findings, Concl. & Proposed Judgment |
Case Filed: | Jun 24, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 19, 2019 |
Debtor
The Containership Company (TCC) A/S
, |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 21, 2016 3:47 AM EST |
Defendant
STD Logistics
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Winair Logistics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Weida Freight System Co Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wako Express (HK) Co. Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Universal Shipping Inc. (USI)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Union Logistics, Inc. (Honour Lane Shipping)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
US Pacific Transport, Inc. (CASA)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. United Logistics (Ningbo) Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Translink Shipping, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Topocean
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TT Ocean Logistics, LLC (Traffic Tech)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
T-Z Cargo Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sinicway International Logistics Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Seapassion Logistics Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LCL Lines
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
American International Cargo Service Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Apex Maritime Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Argos Freight, Inc. dba Agility Freight Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Barthco International, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ceva Freight, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Global Forwarding Ltd (Hecny)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Headwin Global Logistics (USA) Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Interglobo North America Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pudong Trans USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Multi-Trans Shipping Agency, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OEC Shipping Los Angeles, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
On Time Shipping Line Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Orient Star Transport Int'l
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pantainer Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
In Re
The Containership Company (TCC) A/S
|
|
Plaintiff
The Containership Company (TCC) A/S
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, November 04, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Costs Taxed
Wed 11/04 4:07 PM
Costs Taxed as to (11 in 1:16-cv-05679-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05711-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05369-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05293-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05453-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05670-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05620-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05431-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05566-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05758-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05697-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05141-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05327-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05637-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05210-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05707-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05423-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05559-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05645-ALC, 13 in 1:16-cv-04913-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05331-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05652-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05158-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05600-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05340-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05380-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05723-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05762-ALC) USCA Mandate. USCA Case Number 19-3394 bk... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that costs are taxed in the amount of $618.40 in favor of Appellees Apex Maritime Co., Inc., Argos Freight, Inc., Barthco International, Inc., CEVA Freight, LLC, Global Forwarding Ltd (Hecny), Interglobo North America Inc., OEC Shipping Los Angelas, Inc., On Time Shipping Line Limited, Orient Star Transport Int'l, Pantainer Ltd., Seapassion Logistics Inc., T-Z Cargo Limited, Topocean, TT Ocean Logistics, LLC (Traffic Tech), U.S. United Logistics (Ningbo) Inc., Wako Express (HK) Co. Ltd. and Winair Logistics, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-04913-ALC et al..(nd) |
|
Thursday, October 29, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 10/29 9:56 AM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to (10 in 1:16-cv-05453-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05670-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05723-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05423-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05559-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05327-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05158-ALC, 12 in 1:16-cv-04913-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05758-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05711-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05431-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05600-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05369-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05697-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05141-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05293-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05380-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05210-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05566-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05707-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05331-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05762-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05645-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05679-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05340-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05637-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05652-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05620-ALC) Notice of Appeal filed by The Containership Company (TCC) A/S. USCA Case Number 19-3394 bk. UPON DUE CONSIDERATION, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED,AND DECREED that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 10/29/2020. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-04913-ALC et al..(nd) |
|
appeal
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge
Thu 10/29 9:57 AM
Transmission of USCA Mandate to the District Judge re: (11 in 1:16-cv-05423-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05679-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05711-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05645-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05559-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05369-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05293-ALC, 13 in 1:16-cv-04913-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05453-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05670-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05620-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05331-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05431-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05652-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05566-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05758-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05697-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05158-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05141-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05600-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05340-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05380-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05327-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05637-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05762-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05723-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05210-ALC, 11 in 1:16-cv-05707-ALC) USCA Mandate. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-04913-ALC et al..(nd) |
||
Wednesday, October 16, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 10/16 4:26 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL from (9 in 1:16-cv-04913-ALC) Clerk's Judgment,,,,,, (8 in 1:16-cv-04913-ALC, 7 in 1:16-cv-05723-ALC, 7 in 1:16-cv-05600-ALC, 7 in 1:16-cv-05637-ALC, 7 in 1:16-cv-05340-ALC, 7 in 1:16-cv-05431-ALC, 7 in 1:16-cv-05141-ALC, 7 in 1:16-cv-05697-ALC, 7 in 1:16-cv-05293-ALC, 7 in 1:16-cv-05559-ALC, 7 in 1:16-cv-05331-ALC, 7 in 1:16-cv-05707-ALC, 7 in 1:16-cv-05711-ALC, 7 in 1:16-cv-05620-ALC, 7 in 1:16-cv-05679-ALC, 7 in 1:16-cv-05652-ALC, 7 in 1:16-cv-05645-ALC, 7 in 1:16-cv-05158-ALC, 7 in 1:16-cv-05423-ALC, 7 in 1:16-cv-05369-ALC, 7 in 1:16-cv-05762-ALC, 7 in 1:16-cv-05566-ALC, 7 in 1:16-cv-05670-ALC, 7 in 1:16-cv-05758-ALC, 7 in 1:16-cv-05210-ALC, 7 in 1:16-cv-05380-ALC, 7 in 1:16-cv-05327-ALC, 7 in 1:16-cv-05453-ALC) Memorandum & Opinion,,. Document filed by The Containership Company (TCC) A/S. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number NYSDC-17783487. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-04913-ALC et al.(Singleton, Richard) |
|
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Wed 10/16 4:34 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: (10 in 1:16-cv-05453-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05600-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05369-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05670-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05697-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05723-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05423-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05141-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05559-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05327-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05293-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05158-ALC, 12 in 1:16-cv-04913-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05758-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05380-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05210-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05566-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05711-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05707-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05331-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05762-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05645-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05679-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05340-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05637-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05431-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05652-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05620-ALC) Notice of Appeal,,,,. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-04913-ALC et al.(nd) |
||
appeal
Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File
Wed 10/16 4:35 PM
Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for (10 in 1:16-cv-05453-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05600-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05369-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05670-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05697-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05723-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05423-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05141-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05559-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05327-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05293-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05158-ALC, 12 in 1:16-cv-04913-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05758-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05380-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05210-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05566-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05711-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05707-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05331-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05762-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05645-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05679-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05340-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05637-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05431-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05652-ALC, 10 in 1:16-cv-05620-ALC) Notice of Appeal,,,, filed by The Containership Company (TCC) A/S were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-04913-ALC et al.(nd) |
||
Friday, October 11, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
11
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
Sat 10/12 12:55 PM
ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR APPEAL: granting10 LETTER MOTION to Consolidate Cases 16cv5327 et al., The Court, having considered the procedural status of the above-captioned cases and upon request of the Plaintiff, which request is unopposed by the Defendants, and finding good reason for these cases to be consolidated for administrative purposes and appeal, determines that all of the cases referenced above should be consolidated under the main case, In re: The Containership Company (TCC) A/S, USDC-SDNY Civ. Act. No. 16-cv-4913 (ALC). Therefore, the Court ORDERS that the following above-captioned cases be consolidated under the main case, No. 16-cv-4913: as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 10/11/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-04913-ALC et al. (ama) |
|
Tuesday, October 08, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Consolidate Cases
Tue 10/08 3:39 PM
LETTER MOTION to Consolidate Cases 16cv5327 et al., addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Richard V. Singleton II dated 10/08/2019. Document filed by The Containership Company (TCC) A/S.(Singleton, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix A- List of Cases, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order /Consolidation of Cases | ||
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment - Clerk
Fri 09/20 9:53 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:8 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of American International Cargo Service Inc., Apex Maritime Co., Inc., Argos Freight, Inc. dba Agility Freight Inc., Barthco International, Inc., Ceva Freight, LLC, Global Forwarding Ltd (Hecny), Headwin Global Logistics (USA) Inc., Interglobo North America Inc., LCL Lines, Multi-Trans Shipping Agency, Inc., OEC Shipping Los Angeles, Inc., On Time Shipping Line Limited, Orient Star Transport Int'l, Pantainer Ltd., Pudong Trans USA, Inc., STD Logistics, Seapassion Logistics Inc., Sinicway International Logistics Ltd., T-Z Cargo Limited, TT Ocean Logistics, LLC (Traffic Tech), Topocean, Translink Shipping, Inc., U.S. United Logistics (Ningbo) Inc., US Pacific Transport, Inc. (CASA), Union Logistics, Inc. (Honour Lane Shipping), Universal Shipping Inc. (USI), Wako Express (HK) Co. Ltd., Weida Freight System Co Ltd., Winair Logistics, Inc. against The Containership Company (TCC) A/S. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion & Order dated September 19, 2019, and after conducting the required de novo review of the record and applicable law, the Court accepts Judge Garrity's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law in full. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in each of these adversary proceedings is hereby DENIED. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment in each of these adversary proceedings is hereby GRANTED; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 9/19/2019)(km) Modified on 9/20/2019 (km) |
|
Att: 1 Right to Appeal | ||
Tuesday, September 17, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
14
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Tue 09/17 3:30 PM
OPINION & ORDER: After conducting the required de novo review of the record and applicable law, the Court accepts Judge Garrity's Prposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law in full. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in each of these adversary proceedings is hereby DENIED. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment in each of these adversary proceedings is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment and close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/17/2019) (ks) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Wed 04/17 1:21 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Richard V. Singleton, Counsel to TCC dated April 17, 2019 re: Danish Bankruptcy Court Correspondence and request for status update,. Document filed by The Containership Company (TCC) A/S.(Singleton, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A_List of Defendants, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B_Letter from Danish Bankruptcy Court | ||
Friday, July 22, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter
Fri 07/22 1:36 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Jeremy A. Herschaft dated 07/22/16 re: Request to Remove Attorneys J. Harwood and M. Smith from Docket. Document filed by The Containership Company (TCC) A/S.(Herschaft, Jeremy) |
|
Friday, June 24, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
respoth
Response (non-motion)
Fri 06/24 5:26 PM
RESPONSE re:2 Objection (non-motion),,,. Document filed by The Containership Company (TCC) A/S. (bkar) |
|
4 | 4
respoth
Response (non-motion)
Fri 06/24 5:23 PM
RESPONSE re:3 Objection (non-motion). Document filed by American International Cargo Service Inc., Apex Maritime Co., Inc., Argos Freight, Inc. dba Agility Freight Inc., Barthco International, Inc., Ceva Freight, LLC, Global Forwarding Ltd (Hecny), Headwin Global Logistics (USA) Inc., Interglobo North America Inc., LCL Lines, Multi-Trans Shipping Agency, Inc., OEC Shipping Los Angeles, Inc., On Time Shipping Line Limited, Orient Star Transport Int'l, Pantainer Ltd., Pudong Trans USA, Inc., STD Logistics, Seapassion Logistics Inc., Sinicway International Logistics Ltd., T-Z Cargo Limited, TT Ocean Logistics, LLC (Traffic Tech), Topocean, Translink Shipping, Inc., U.S. United Logistics (Ningbo) Inc., US Pacific Transport, Inc. (CASA), Union Logistics, Inc. (Honour Lane Shipping), Universal Shipping Inc. (USI), Wako Express (HK) Co. Ltd., Weida Freight System Co Ltd., Winair Logistics, Inc.. (bkar) |
|
3 | 3
respoth
Objection (non-motion)
Fri 06/24 5:14 PM
Objection re:1 Bankruptcy Court Proposed Findings of Fact. Document filed by The Containership Company (TCC) A/S.(bkar) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
2 | 2
respoth
Objection (non-motion)
Fri 06/24 5:08 PM
Objection re:1 Bankruptcy Court Proposed Findings of Fact. Document filed by American International Cargo Service Inc., Apex Maritime Co., Inc., Argos Freight, Inc. dba Agility Freight Inc., Barthco International, Inc., Ceva Freight, LLC, Global Forwarding Ltd (Hecny), Headwin Global Logistics (USA) Inc., Interglobo North America Inc., LCL Lines, Multi-Trans Shipping Agency, Inc., OEC Shipping Los Angeles, Inc., On Time Shipping Line Limited, Orient Star Transport Int'l, Pantainer Ltd., Pudong Trans USA, Inc., STD Logistics, Seapassion Logistics Inc., Sinicway International Logistics Ltd., T-Z Cargo Limited, TT Ocean Logistics, LLC (Traffic Tech), Topocean, Translink Shipping, Inc., U.S. United Logistics (Ningbo) Inc., US Pacific Transport, Inc. (CASA), Union Logistics, Inc. (Honour Lane Shipping), Universal Shipping Inc. (USI), Wako Express (HK) Co. Ltd., Weida Freight System Co Ltd., Winair Logistics, Inc.. (bkar) |
|
1 | 1
trial
Bankruptcy Court Proposed Findings of Fact
Fri 06/24 12:56 PM
BANKRUPTCY COURT PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW TO THE DISTRICT COURT By Judge James L. Garrity Jr. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 11-B-12622 (JLG).(bkar) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Proposed Findings | ||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 06/24 1:03 PM
Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. (bkar) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 06/24 1:03 PM
Case Designated ECF. (bkar) |