Tiffany and Company v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lewis J Liman |
Referred: | Debra C Freeman |
Case #: | 1:13-cv-01041 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1051 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Feb 14, 2013 |
Re-opened: | Sep 08, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jul 19, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 10, 2015 6:49 PM EST |
Counter Claimant
Costco Wholesale Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Tiffany (NJ) LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Tiffany and Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Costco Wholesale Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
The Swatch Group Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tiffany (NJ) LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tiffany and Company
|
Represented By
|
1. | Costco owes Tiffany more than $19 million for selling counterfeit engagement rings (money.cnn.com) |
Submitted Mon 08/14/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, February 25, 2022 | ||
529 | 529
order
Endorsed Letter
Fri 02/25 11:39 AM
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Brendan Joseph O'Rourke and David H. Bernstein from Ruby J. Krajick, Clerk of Court dated 2/25/2022 re: Judge Liman informed me that it has been brought to his attention that while he presided over the case, his wife owned stock in Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 2/25/2022) (rro) |
|
misc
Mail Order by USPS
Fri 02/25 1:04 PM
Mailed a copy of529 Endorsed Letter via FedEx overnight mail to Brendan Joseph O'Rourke at Proskauer Rose LLP (NYC), 11 Times Square, New York, NY 10036 (Tracking # 8173 8706 4307). (kh) |
||
misc
Mail Order by USPS
Fri 02/25 1:06 PM
Mailed a copy of529 Endorsed Letter via FedEx overnight mail to David H. Bernstein at Debevoise & Plimpton, LLP (NYC), 919 Third Avenue, 3rd Floor, New York, NY 10022 (Tracking # 8173 8706 4292). (kh) |