LABORERS LOCAL UNION NOS. 472 & 172 et al v. LONGWOOD CONSTRUCTION IND. LLC
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Robert B Kugler |
Referred: | Ann Marie Donio |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-03732 |
Nature of Suit | 896 Other Statutes - Arbitration |
Cause | 9:9 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Loan |
Case Filed: | Jun 24, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 19, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 21, 2016 4:26 AM EST |
Petitioner
LABORERS LOCAL UNION NOS. 472 & 172
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
LABORERS LOCAL UNION NOS. 472 & 172 WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS AND SAFETY, EDUCATION AND TRAINING FUNDS
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
ZAZZALI, FAGELLA, NOWAK, KLEINBAUM & FRIEDMAN, P.A.
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
LONGWOOD CONSTRUCTION IND. LLC
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 19, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion to Confirm or Vacate Arbitration
Tue 07/19 11:00 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion to Confirm or Vacate Arbitration; Judgment in favor of Petitioners LABORERS LOCAL UNION NOS. 472 & 172, LABORERS LOCAL UNION NOS. 472 & 172 WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS AND SAFETY, EDUCATION AND TRAINING FUNDS and ZAZZALI, FAGELLA, NOWAK, KLEINBAUM & FRIEDMAN, P.A. against Respondent LONGWOOD CONSTRUCTION IND. LLC in the amount of $11,644.80. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 7/18/2016. (tf, ) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 07/19 11:02 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (tf, ) |
||
Monday, June 27, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 06/27 12:34 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by LABORERS LOCAL UNION NOS. 472 & 172, LABORERS LOCAL UNION NOS. 472 & 172 WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS AND SAFETY, EDUCATION AND TRAINING FUNDS. (O'HARE, EDWARD) |
|
order
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 06/27 11:01 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to2 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award. Responses due by 7/18/2016. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/27/2016. (rtm, ) |
||
qc
QC - Lack of Disclosure Statement
Mon 06/27 11:02 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (rtm, ) |
||
Friday, June 24, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Confirm or Vacate Arbitration
Mon 06/27 10:48 AM
MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award by LABORERS LOCAL UNION NOS. 472 & 172, LABORERS LOCAL UNION NOS. 472 & 172 WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS AND SAFETY, EDUCATION AND TRAINING FUNDS, ZAZZALI, FAGELLA, NOWAK, KLEINBAUM & FRIEDMAN, P.A..(rtm, ) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition to Confirm or Vacate Arbitration Award
Mon 06/27 10:44 AM
PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7186343.), filed by LABORERS LOCAL UNION NOS. 472 & 172, LABORERS LOCAL UNION NOS. 472 & 172 WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS AND SAFETY, EDUCATION AND TRAINING FUNDS, ZAZZALI, FAGELLA, NOWAK, KLEINBAUM & FRIEDMAN, P.A..(rtm, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |