Trushenski v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Richard Nelson |
Referred: | Janie S Mayeron |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-02141 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 22, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 24, 2016 3:05 AM CST |
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Trushenski
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, September 22, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
Thu 09/22 11:18 AM
JUDGMENT(AKL) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal | ||
14 | 14
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 09/22 8:59 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to the stipulation13 of the parties. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 09/22/16. (MJC) |
|
Wednesday, September 21, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 09/21 4:16 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Life Insurance Company of North America. Jointly Signed by Linda Trushenski. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
Thursday, September 15, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order
Thu 09/15 1:33 PM
ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 10/31/2016 01:30 PM in Judge's Chambers 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 9/15/16.(LEG) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
Wednesday, August 31, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney
Wed 08/31 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Berger, Michael) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/31 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Santos on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
Wednesday, August 24, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Wed 08/24 4:33 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Connecticut General Corporation is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. CIGNA Holdings, Inc. is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. CIGNA Corporation is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Berger, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 08/24 4:31 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Berger, Michael) |
|
Friday, July 08, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/08 1:12 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel K. Ryan for Life Insurance Company of North America. Approved by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 7/8/16. (MAM) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident)
Fri 07/08 11:01 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5010223 by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Berger, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, July 06, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 07/06 5:22 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 6/27/2016, answer due 8/26/2016. (Berger, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/06 5:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T Berger on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Berger, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, June 28, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/28 8:25 AM
Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (kt) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Tue 06/28 8:22 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. Please use case number 16-cv-2141 SRN/JSM. (kt) |
|
Monday, June 27, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/27 5:06 PM
COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-4994977.) Filed by Linda Trushenski. Filer requests summons issued. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |