Nguyen v. Livingston
Utah District Court | |
Judge: | Jill N Parrish |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-00707 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 24, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 05, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 21, 2016 1:30 AM MST |
Defendant
Linton Dale Livingston
5210 HUNTINGTON RD
TAYLORSVILLE, UT 84129 |
|
Plaintiff
Hanh Nguyen
3723 W SPRINGWATER DR
SALT LAKE CITY, UT 84120 |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 26, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Receipt
Wed 07/27 12:58 PM
RECEIPT from Third District Court, Salt Lake County. (jlw) |
|
Tuesday, July 05, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Transmittal
Tue 07/05 4:05 PM
NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL that case has been remanded to 3rd District Court, Salt Lake County via U.S. First Class Mail. A certified copy of8 Order of Remand sent (case number in State Court - 160408243). (eat) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 07/05 3:51 PM
ORDER OF REMAND. Mr. Livingston has improperly removed this action to federal court. There is no basis for federal court jurisdiction. Accordingly, the court remands this matter to state court for further proceedings. Motions terminated: 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Linton Dale Livingston. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/5/2016. (eat) |
|
7 | 7
utility
Reassignment to District Judge
Tue 07/05 10:48 AM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT - Case Reassigned to District Judge per 6 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Case randomly assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (jwt) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order
Tue 07/05 10:42 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to court policy, plaintiff's request for immediate injunctive relief renders this case ineligible for consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge. Accordingly, the court orders that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 7/5/16. (dla) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 07/05 4:07 PM
Civil Case Terminated per8 Order of Remand. (eat) |
||
Thursday, June 30, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
13
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Tue 07/05 10:32 AM
Complaint MEMORANDUM in Support re4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Protect Federal Court and Congressional Law Jurisdiction Involving State Order Denying State Case Removal to Federal Court filed by Defendant Linton Dale Livingston.(jwt) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement - Submission of Necessary Pleadings of Respondent, Claimed as Defendant, of State Required Three Day Response, with Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement - Timely Resopnse of Respondent, Opposition, and Expose of Case, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 - The Checks Paid Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 - The Investors Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - The Hanh Bich Nguyen Fraudulent Transfer of Deed Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - The 30 K False Claim Exhibit | ||
4 | 4
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Tue 07/05 10:22 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendant Linton Dale Livingston.(jwt) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment
Thu 06/30 9:25 AM
NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use[LINK:the form on this link] or use the included form for non-efilers and send it to consents@utd.uscourts.gov within 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Linton Dale Livingston, Plaintiff Hanh Nguyen. Form due by 7/15/2016. (las) |
|
Wednesday, June 29, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of ADR
Wed 06/29 2:27 PM
NOTICE OF ADR, mailed to Defendant Linton Dale Livingston, Plaintiff Hanh Nguyen. (dla) |
|
Friday, June 24, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 06/27 9:54 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Salt Lake County Utah, case number 160408243. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4681072707) filed by Linton Dale Livingston. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (dla) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit to Notice of Removal Standing Bias Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement Copy of State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Supplement Copy of State Court Summons served on Linton Dale Livingston |