Avarista v. Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island et al
Rhode Island District Court | |
Judge: | Mary M Lisi |
Referred: | Patricia A Sullivan |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00373 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Jun 28, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 03, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 25, 2016 3:51 AM EST |
Defendant
Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shannon McLoughlin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Avarista
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
order
Order
Mon 04/03 10:32 AM
TEXT ORDER entering14 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 4/3/2017. (Feeley, Susan) |
||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 03/31 9:13 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Shannon McLoughlin (McAllister, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Tue 01/17 7:58 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Settlement Conference held on 1/17/2017. (Chambers at 2:00.) (Saucier, Martha) |
||
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 01/03 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Pushee on behalf of Kenneth Avarista (Pushee, Michael) |
|
minutes
Telephone Conference
Tue 01/03 4:26 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 1/3/2017 with Attorneys Michael Pushee and Jeffrey McAllister. (Chambers at 4:00.) (Saucier, Martha) |
||
Thursday, December 29, 2016 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 12/29 2:17 PM
RESCHEDULING NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference RESCHEDULED for 1/3/2017 at 04:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers - Room P-285 before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. THE COURT WILL INITIATE THE CALL. MOVED FROM 12/30/2016 PER MJ SULLIVAN. (Noel, Jeannine) |
||
Wednesday, November 02, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 11/02 9:41 AM
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER, ( Settlement Conference set for 1/13/2017 at 02:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers - Room P-285 before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan., Telephone Conference set for 12/30/2016 at 09:30 AM in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers - Room P-285 before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan with counsel of record.)Court to initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 11/2/2016. (Saucier, Martha) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Wed 11/02 9:32 AM
TEXT ORDER granting11 Motion to Continue Settlement Conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 11/2/16. (Saucier, Martha) |
||
notice
Hearing Cancelled
Wed 11/02 9:33 AM
HEARING CANCELLED re9 Settlement Conference set for 11/10/2016 at 02:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers - Room P-285 before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan has been cancelled. Court to reschedule. (Saucier, Martha) |
||
Tuesday, November 01, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Continue
Tue 11/01 10:26 AM
Joint MOTION to Continue Settlement Conference filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 11/18/2016 (McAllister, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, August 17, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 08/17 2:50 PM
NOTICE by Kenneth Avarista Notice of Withdrawal (Formisano, V.) |
|
Wednesday, August 03, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 08/03 10:55 AM
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 11/10/2016 at 02:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers - Room P-285 before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Telephone Conference set for 10/26/2016 at 09:30 AM in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers - Room P-285 before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan with Counsel of record. Court to initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 8/2/2016. (Saucier, Martha) |
|
Monday, August 01, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 08/01 2:20 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Any Amended Complaint due by 9/1/2016. Factual Discovery due by 2/1/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 2/15/2017. Pretrial Memorandum due by 3/1/2017. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 8/1/2016. (Feeley, Susan) |
|
minutes
Rule 16 Conference
Mon 08/01 11:24 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi: Rule 16 Conference held on 8/1/2016. Counsel present: A. Galoski, M. Pushee, J. McAllister. (Feeley, Susan) |
||
utility
Remark
Mon 08/01 2:22 PM
This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan for a Settlement Conference sometime in early November, 2016. (Feeley, Susan) |
||
Wednesday, July 20, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Rule 16 Statement
Wed 07/20 12:45 PM
RULE 16 STATEMENT by Kenneth Avarista. (Formisano, V.) |
|
Monday, July 18, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/18 9:33 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alyse E. Galoski on behalf of Kenneth Avarista (Galoski, Alyse) |
|
Wednesday, July 06, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 07/06 11:11 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference set for 8/1/2016 at 11:00 AM in Judge Lisi Chambers - Room 310 before Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi. A Rule 16 Statement for party/parties asserting a claim is due at least seven (7) days prior to the conference (see attached document). (Feeley, Susan) |
|
Tuesday, July 05, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
6
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 07/05 4:48 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Shannon McLoughlin.(McConnell, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, June 29, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/29 11:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. McAllister on behalf of All Defendants (McAllister, Jeffrey) |
|
2 | 2
misc
State Court Record
Wed 06/29 9:37 AM
STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island filed by Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Shannon McLoughlin. (Jackson, Kerrie) |
|
Tuesday, June 28, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal - New Case
Tue 06/28 4:00 PM
NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number 2016-2603. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-982927, filed by Shannon McLoughlin, Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island.(McConnell, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/28 4:16 PM
Case assigned to Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael) |