Ritchey v. Hazelden Betty Ford Foundation
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | David S Doty |
Referred: | Katherine M Menendez |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-02208 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 28, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 21, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 25, 2016 2:25 AM CST |
Defendant
Hazelden Betty Ford Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Ritchey
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 12/21 8:51 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 12/21/2016. (DLO) |
|
Tuesday, December 20, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
service
Certificate of Service on Proposed Order
Tue 12/20 10:28 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Hazelden Betty Ford Foundation re17 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice (Phillips, Penelope) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 12/20 10:19 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Hazelden Betty Ford Foundation. Jointly Signed by David Ritchey. (Phillips, Penelope) |
|
Wednesday, October 12, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
minutes
Telephone Conference
Wed 10/12 10:31 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Telephone Conference held on 10/12/2016. Counsel update the Court regarding plans for private mediation. (MMP) |
|
Monday, September 19, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
7
pgs
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 09/19 4:45 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2017. Discovery due by 5/1/2017. Motions (non-disp) due 6/15/2017. Motions (disp) due by 12/16/2017. Ready for trial due by 4/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 9/19/2016. (lmb) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 09/19 2:43 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE of Setting Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/12/2016 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. The Court will send the parties call-in instructions by e-mail.(BJP) |
|
Monday, September 12, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Tue 09/13 9:52 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Pretrial Conference held on 9/12/2016. (JDF) |
|
Wednesday, September 07, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
9
pgs
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Wed 09/07 9:12 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Hazelden Betty Ford Foundation. Jointly Signed by David Ritchey.(Winter, Randi) |
|
Tuesday, August 02, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
9
pgs
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 08/02 10:36 AM
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez.(MMP) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Consent Form | ||
Thursday, July 21, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/21 10:08 AM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Hazelden Betty Ford Foundation. (Phillips, Penelope) |
|
9 | 9
10
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 07/21 10:06 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Hazelden Betty Ford Foundation. (Phillips, Penelope) |
|
Friday, July 15, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 07/15 11:00 AM
ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 7/15/2016. (CLB) |
|
Tuesday, July 12, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order of Recusal
Tue 07/12 1:33 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 16-cv-2208 DSD/KMM . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 7/12/16. (kt) |
|
Monday, July 11, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order of Recusal
Mon 07/11 3:52 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Ann D. Montgomery recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge David S. Doty for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 16cv2208 DSD/SER . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 7/11/16. (AKL) |
|
Thursday, July 07, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice to Attorney - Case Reassigned
Thu 07/07 11:01 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. This case is reassigned to Judge Ann D. Montgomery. Judge Richard H. Kyle no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 16cv2208 ADM/SER . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (AKL) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order
Thu 07/07 10:30 AM
ORDER for Disqualification and for Reassignment. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 7/7/16. (KLL) |
|
Wednesday, June 29, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/29 8:42 AM
Summons Issued as to Hazelden Betty Ford Foundation. (KNK) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Wed 06/29 8:40 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Richard H. Kyle per Civil Rights-all others referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 16-cv-2208 (RHK/SER). (KNK) |
|
Tuesday, June 28, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/28 5:33 PM
COMPLAINT against Hazelden Betty Ford Foundation. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-4997073.) Filed by David Ritchey. Filer requests summons issued. (Gilbert, Heather) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |