Striker v. Longley
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel P Jordan, III |
Referred: | F Keith Ball |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-00519 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal) |
Case Filed: | Jun 28, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 15, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Judgment
Fri 06/15 4:09 PM
JUDGMENT. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment be and is hereby entered in favor of the respondent, and that this action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 06/15/2018 (VM) |
|
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Fri 06/15 4:04 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation20 of United States Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball be, and the same is hereby, adopted as the finding of this Court. The Petition is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 06/15/2018.(VM) |
|
Wednesday, May 23, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Report and Recommendations
Wed 05/23 9:19 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Duffy Lynn Striker. Objections to R&R due by 6/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/23/18. (Copy mailed to Petitioner at FCC, P.O. Box 5000, Yazoo City, MS 39194.) (dfk) |
|
Friday, December 23, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
respoth
Response in Opposition
Fri 12/23 10:43 AM
Response in Opposition re15 RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Archie B. Longley and16 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re15 Response to Habeas Petition, filed by Archie B. Longley filed by Duffy Lynn Striker.(RRL) |
|
Att: 1 Letter/Envelope | ||
18 | 18
misc
Change of Address
Fri 12/23 10:35 AM
Change of Address filed by Duffy Lynn Striker. (RRL) |
|
Tuesday, November 01, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Sealed Document
Tue 11/01 9:57 AM
Sealed Exhibits RE:15 Response to Habeas Petition, filed by Archie B. Longley.(RRL) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Monday, October 31, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
9
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Mon 10/31 5:41 PM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re15 Response to Habeas Petition, filed by Archie B. Longley (Perez-Federal Gov, Marc) |
|
15 | 15
answer
Response to Habeas Petition
Mon 10/31 5:39 PM
RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Archie B. Longley.(Perez-Federal Gov, Marc) |
|
Att: 1 EX A - INDICTMENT filed under seal pursuant to Order of Oct 31 2016, | ||
Att: 2 EX B - PLEA AGREEMENT AND CONDITIONS filed under seal pursuant to Order of Oct 31 2016, | ||
Att: 3 r_EX C -JUDGMENT, | ||
Att: 4 EX D - ORDER ECF NO. 26, | ||
Att: 5 EX E - SENTRY - PUBLIC INFORMATION INMATE DATA | ||
Thursday, September 08, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 09/08 9:03 AM
Text-only ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Archie B. Longley answer due 10/31/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 9/8/16. (No further written order will be issued.) (Copy mailed to Petitioner.) (dfk) |
||
Wednesday, August 31, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 08/31 1:24 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Archie B. Longley (Perez - Federal Gov, Marc) |
|
Friday, August 05, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Fri 08/05 11:23 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Archie B. Longley served on 8/5/2016, answer due 10/5/2016. (RRL) |
|
Wednesday, August 03, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 08/03 2:02 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re2 Memorandum in Support,1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,4 Order. Mail sent to Warden Archie B. Longley. (RRL) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 08/03 9:21 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Archie B. Longley answer due 8/31/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 8/3/16. (Copy mailed to Petitioner.) (dfk) |
|
Monday, August 01, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Mon 08/01 2:24 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Archie B. Longley served on 8/1/2016, answer due 10/1/2016. (RRL) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 08/01 10:34 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Archie B. Longley (Perez - Federal Gov, Marc) |
|
Friday, July 15, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Fri 07/15 2:13 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Archie B. Longley served on 7/12/2016, answer due 9/12/2016. (RRL) |
|
Tuesday, July 12, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Tue 07/12 10:09 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Archie B. Longley served on 7/11/2016, answer due 9/11/2016. (RRL) |
|
Thursday, July 07, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Thu 07/07 1:37 PM
ORDER, the Respondent Warden Archie B. Longley shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this cause within 20 days of the service of a copy of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/7/2016 (LDR) |
|
misc
Filing Fee Received
Thu 07/07 11:35 AM
Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 34643040107 (TLC) |
||
Wednesday, June 29, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Wed 06/29 12:44 PM
ORDER, on or before July 20, 2016, petitioner shall complete and file the attached application or pay the $5.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/29/2016 (LDR) |
|
Tuesday, June 28, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
13
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Tue 06/28 2:30 PM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Duffy Lynn Striker. (RRL) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 06/28 2:29 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Duffy Lynn Striker.(RRL) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Assignment |