California Northern District Court
Judge:Phyllis J Hamilton
Case #: 3:16-cv-03607
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2016
Last checked: Saturday Dec 24, 2016 12:57 AM PST
Defendant
Akima Infrastructure Services, LLC
Represented By
Gregory G. Iskander
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Billie Desiree Wenter
Glynn & Finley LLP
contact info
Defendant
Akima, LLC
Represented By
Gregory G. Iskander
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Sarah Rodriguez
Represented By
Joseph Clapp
Aiman-Smith & Marcy
contact info
Donald Joseph Clapp
Aiman-Smith And Marcy
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, July 14, 2016
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 1:58 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sarah Rodriguez.. (Clapp, Donald) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2016
5 5 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 4:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Akima Infrastructure Services, LLC, Akima, LLC [Supplemental Certificate of Service] (Iskander, Gregory) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2016
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 11:08 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/22/2016. Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2016
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 9:03 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 7/12/2016. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2016
2 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Akima Infrastructure Services, LLC, Akima, LLC (Defendants' Certification of Interested Entitites Or Persons Pursuant to 7.1 And Civil Local Rule 3-15) (Iskander, Gregory) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court 28 U.S.C. Sections 1331, 1332, 1367 and 1441(a)) from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG16816085. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-10562429). Filed byAkima, LLC, Akima Infrastructure Services, LLC.(Iskander, Gregory) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Steven Steinberg,
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
respoth Answer to Removal Complaint Wed 11:06 AM
Answer to Removed Complaint (See Document1 pg. 29) by Akima Infrastructure Services, LLC, Akima, LLC. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
Related: [-]