P N K Lake Charles L L C v. Tannous et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Patricia Minaldi |
Referred: | Kathleen Kay |
Case #: | 2:13-cv-00474 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 05, 2013 |
Terminated: | Jan 29, 2016 |
Last checked: Friday Jan 09, 2015 9:02 PM CST |
Counter Claimant
Constandi Lubbat
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
P N K Lake Charles L L C
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Constandi Lubbat
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
P N K Lake Charles L L C
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Stephen Mouton
Terminated: 05/15/2014
P O Box 149
Iowa, LA 70647 |
|
Defendant
Charbel Gerges Tannous
Terminated: 11/01/2013
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Derrick Weldon
Terminated: 05/28/2014
2101 Evelyn St
Lake Charles, LA 70601 |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, January 29, 2016 | ||
53 | 53
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Fri 01/29 2:55 PM
ORDER granting52 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Partial Dismiss; IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that all claims asserted by plaintiff, PNK against defendant, Constandi Lubbat, with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 1/26/2015. (crt,FinnSld, P) |