ANLOC, LLC and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:12-bk-31267 |
Case Filed: | Feb 16, 2012 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jun 12, 2012 |
Converted: | Apr 20, 2012 |
Terminated: | May 09, 2013 |
Plan Confirmed: | Jan 23, 2013 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
Nature of Business | Other |
Debtor
ANLOC, LLC
8955 Katy Fwy Ste 310
Houston, TX 77024-1678 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Counter-Defendant
Alexander Energy
85 Jeffrey Pine Lane
Carson City, NV 89705 |
|
Counter-Defendant
James W. Alexander Living Trust
85 Jeffrey Pine Lane
Carson, NV 89705 |
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
1415 N. Loop West, Ste 1020
Houston, TX 77008 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Innovative Energy Services, Inc.
180000 Groschke Road, Building A1
Houston, TX 77084 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gaither Petroleum Corp.
16600 Park Row
Houston, TX 77084 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
GPO
Jan 22 2013
Memorandum Opinion of Bankruptcy Judge Signed on 1/22/2013 (adol) |
|
GPO
Apr 04 2013
Memorandum Opinion of Bankruptcy Judge Signed on 4/4/2013 (adol) |