Edge Capture L.L.C. et al v. Barclays Bank PLC et al
Illinois Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Norgle, Sr |
Case #: | 1:09-cv-01521 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:145 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2009 |
Terminated: | Nov 26, 2012 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 26, 2016 6:19 PM CST |
Counter Claimant
Barclays Capital Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Wolverine Trading, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Wolverine Execution Services, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wolverine Trading, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wolverine Execution Services, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Barclays Capital Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Barclays Bank PLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edge Specialists, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edge Capture L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Counter Claimant
UBS Financial Services Inc.
Terminated: 06/13/2012
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
UBS Securities, L.L.C.
Terminated: 06/13/2012
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Edge Capture L.L.C.
Terminated: 06/13/2012
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Edge Specialists, L.L.C.
Terminated: 06/13/2012
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UBS AG
Terminated: 06/08/2012
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UBS Securities, L.L.C.
Terminated: 06/08/2012
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UBS Financial Services Inc.
Terminated: 06/08/2012
|
Represented By
|