New Jersey District Court
Case #: 3:09-cv-01814
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2009
Terminated:Oct 04, 2011
Defendant
"FEDERAL AUTO PROTECTION"
Defendant
"NATIONAL DEALERS WARRANTY"
Defendant
303-749-9642, 310-485-8905, 402-982-0602, 509-935-0671, 603-214-3340, 603-214-3658, 626-273-8207, 636-688-5522, 773-321-2949, 949-256-9116, 949-256-9145, 978-570-2249, 561-784-9844 and 305-836-7371
Defendant
989-637-1044, 773-728-8019, 603-214-3674, 818-870-5070, 402-982-0582, 978-570-2308, 909-650-9103, 760-526-8562, 909-650-9101, 909-842-9188, 205-561-2815, 208-664-0749, 213-710-8113, 269-768-2199
Defendant
CONRAD INVESTMENTS GROUP INC.
Defendant
DEALER WARRANTY SERVICES, LLC
Defendant
DEALERS PREFERRED WARRANTIES, LLC
Defendant
DEALERS WARRANTY, LLC
Defendant
DIRECT PROTECT WARRANTY
Defendant
EXPLICIT MEDIA, INC.
Defendant
JOHN DOE NO. 1
Defendant
JOHN DOES 2-50
Defendant
JZ INVESTMENTS INC
Defendant
NATIONAL DEALERS WARRANTY, INC.
Defendant
OWNER, USER OR "SPOOFER" OF TELEPHONE NUMBERS 949-256-9145, 909-650-9178, 909-650-9173, 909-650-9154, 616-980-2584, 402-982-0477, 402-982-0524, 775-337-6175, 202-610-3068, 818-870-9251
Defendant
TELE EUROPE, B.V.
Defendant
TELEPHONE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION
Defendant
TM CALLER ID, LLC
Defendant
TRANSCONTINENTAL WARRANTY, INC.
Defendant
VOICE TOUCH, INC.
Defendant
WARRANTY INVESTMENT SERVICES LLC
Defendant
WARRANTY SERVICES
Mediator
GARY S. STEIN
Notice Only
CLAIRE E. GORMAN
Notice Only
MICHAEL MOIRANO
Notice Only
nefmedtre
Notice Only
PARKER D. YOUNG
Notice Only
PAUL F. WOODY
Notice Only
TIMOTHY A. DANIELS
Plaintiff
CELLCO PARTNERSHIP
Plaintiff
GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION
Plaintiff
ONSTAR, LLC.
Plaintiff
VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS INC.
Plaintiff
VERIZON WIRELESS
Plaintiff
VODAFONE GROUP PLC.
ThirdParty Defendant
EXPLICIT MEDIA, INC.
ThirdParty Plaintiff
DEALERS WARRANTY, LLC

GPO Sep 20 2010
OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/17/2010. (mmh)
GPO Sep 20 2010
OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/17/2010. (mmh)
GPO Oct 05 2010
AMENDED OPINION Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/4/2010. (ss, )


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.