|
GPO
Jun 03 2010
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James A. Parker granting 84 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Order and for Sanctions; Abbasid must pay to LANB $5,582.85 by 6/15/2010 (dmw)
|
|
GPO
Aug 24 2010
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James A. Parker denying 100 Plaintiff Abbasid Inc d/b/a Azhar's Oriental Rug's Rule 60(b) Motion to Vacate Order Denying Abbasid Inc. d/b/a Azhar's Oriental Rug's Motion for a New Trial and Motion to Compel Parties' Attorneys to Return Original Trial Exhibits and as further described herein. (jrm)
|
|
GPO
Sep 09 2010
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. by District Judge James A. Parker that Defendant Los Alamos National Bank's Opposed Motion To Show Cause Why Azhar Said Should Not Be Held In Contempt And For Sanctions (Doc. No. 93) is DENIED in that the Court will not hold Abbasid, Inc or its President, Azhar Said, in contempt and the Court will not award sanctions against Abbasid in favor of LANB & as further described herein. (jrm)
|
|
GPO
Nov 12 2010
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lorenzo F. Garcia Denying Motion 115 for Protective Order. (clm)
|
|
GPO
Nov 22 2010
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lorenzo F. Garcia Granting Los Alamos National Bank's Motion to Compel and Granting Sanction 113. (clm)
|
|
GPO
Jan 03 2011
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DECONSOLIDATING CASE NOS. CIV. 09-347 AND 09-354 by District Judge James A. Parker 114 as described herein. (jrm)
|
|
GPO
Jan 05 2011
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James A. Parker 123; 124 as described herein. (jrm)
|
|
GPO
Feb 17 2011
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lorenzo F. Garcia on Defendant's Motion for Order to Show Cause 130 and Imposing Sanctions. (clm)
|
|
GPO
Apr 19 2011
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior District Judge James A. Parker that Plaintiff's 144 Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order on Defendant's Motion for Order to Show Cause and Imposing Sanctions 139 are Sustained to the extent that the $2,000.00 fine imposed is vacated and as further described herein. (bap)
|
|
GPO
Jun 10 2011
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James A. Parker re: Related document: 150 Memorandum Opinion and Order dated 4/19/2011 concluding that Plaintiff was in civil contempt for failure to comply with Court's orders; It is ORDERED that AZHAR SAID, individually, pay $2,298.74 to Los Alamos National Bank by July 10, 2011 as a result of civil contempt. (bap)
|
|
GPO
Aug 15 2011
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James A. Parker that Defendant Los Alamos National Bank's Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Azhar Said Should Not be Held in Contempt and for Sanctions (Doc. No. 155) is DENIED & as further described herein. (jrm)
|
|
GPO
Jun 26 2012
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James A. Parker that Los Alamos National Bank's Opposed Motion for Order to Show Cause why Azar Said should not be held in Contempt and for Sanctions (Doc.No. 163) is DENIED and as further described herein.. (jrm)
|