Van Zan Frater v. Teenage Millionaire, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | Alicia G Rosenberg |
Case #: | 2:08-cv-07176 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Case Filed: | Oct 30, 2008 |
Terminated: | Jun 17, 2009 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 25, 2016 12:43 PM PST |
Defendant
Apparel of Man, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chris Brick
|
|
Defendant
Buckaroo
|
|
Defendant
Christopher Hoy
|
|
Defendant
Jesus Is My Homeboy, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teenage Millionaire, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teenage Millionaire, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Van Zan Frater
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Judith Brick
Terminated: 03/25/2009
|
|
Defendant
DOES
Terminated: 05/29/2009
|
|
Defendant
K-G Melrose Properties LLC
Terminated: 03/25/2009
|