California Northern District Court
Case #: 3:07-cv-01344
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2007
Terminated:Nov 17, 2009
Defendant
AU Optronics
Defendant
AU Optronics Corporation America
Defendant
Chi Mei Optoelectronics
Defendant
Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc.
Defendant
Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd.
Defendant
CMO Japan Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Epson Imaging Devices Corporation
Defendant
HannStar Display Corporation
Defendant
Hitachi America Ltd.
Defendant
Hitachi Displays, Ltd.
Defendant
Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc.
Defendant
Hitachi Ltd.
Defendant
IDT International Ltd.
Defendant
LG Philips LCD America, Inc.
Defendant
LG Philips LCD Co., LTD.
Defendant
NEC Corporation
Defendant
NEC Electronics America, Inc.
Defendant
NEC LCD Technologies LTD.
Defendant
Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
Defendant
Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.
Defendant
Sharp Corporation
Defendant
Sharp Electronics Corporation
Defendant
Toshiba Corporation
Defendant
Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., Ltd.
Intervenor
Antitrust Division,Department of Justice
Plaintiff
FME Architecture + Design

GPO Apr 03 2007
STIPULATION AND ORDER for extension of time to respond to Complaint and Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 4/3/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2007)
GPO Jul 09 2007
Pretrial ORDER No.1 and Agenda for July 10, 2007 Status Conference. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/3/07. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2007)
GPO Aug 25 2008
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS COMPLAINTS(SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2008)
GPO Nov 19 2008
ORDER RE: DEFENDANT NEXGEN MEDIATECH INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS; QUASHING SERVICE; AND GRANTING DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SERVE NEXGEN THROUGH ITS COUNSEL UNDER FED.R.CIV.P. 4(f)(3) (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
GPO Nov 19 2008
ORDER DENYING THE TOSHIBA ENTITIES' MOTION TO MODIFY MAY 27, 2008 ORDER AND STAY DISCOVERY (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
GPO Dec 05 2008
ORDER DENYING THE TOSHIBA ENTITIES' MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
GPO Mar 03 2009
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT; GRANTING DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
GPO Mar 03 2009
ORDER DENYING TATUNG COMPANY OF AMERICA'S MOTION TO DISMISS DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
GPO May 19 2009
ORDER DENYING DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL AMNESTY APPLICATION DEFENDANT TO COMPLY WITH ACPERA (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
GPO Jun 24 2009
ORDER GRANTING UNITED STATES' MOTION TO MODIFY THE COURT'S SEPTEMBER 25, 2007 ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2009)
GPO Sep 10 2009
ORDER GRANTING AUOA'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING RETURN OF INADVERTENTLY PRODUCED PRIVILEGED DOCUMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
GPO Oct 20 2009
ORDER DENYING UNITED STATES' OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTER'S AUGUST 24, 2009 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
GPO Nov 17 2009
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASES (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/23/2009: # (38) attachment) (ys, COURT STAFF).
GPO Apr 12 2010
ORDER APPOINTING MARTIN QUINN AS SPECIAL MASTER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
GPO May 26 2011
ORDER STIPULATION for extension of time to respond to complaint and [proposed] order by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Limited. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 5/25/2011) (Entered: 05/25/2011) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
GPO Aug 24 2011
ORDER re: extension to time to respond to complaint in 11-3856 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2011)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.