|
GPO
Jan 05 2009
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Medtronic's motion to dismiss the master consolidated complaint for individuals 151 and Medtronic's motion to dismiss the master consolidated complaint for third-party payors 149 are granted.(Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 1/5/09. Associated Cases: 0:08-md-01905-RHK-JSM et al.(VEM)
|
|
GPO
Jan 23 2009
ORDER that on or before January 27, 2009, Plaintiffs and Medtronic shall each submit a letter brief addressing certification under Section 1292. The parties should be prepared to discuss the certification issue at the January 28 status conference. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 01/23/09. Associated Cases: 0:08-md-01905-RHK-JSM et al.(rhks)
|
|
GPO
Feb 05 2009
ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' letter request to file a Motion for Reconsideration; Plaintifs may serve and file a Motion for Leave to Amend the Master Consolidated Complaint for Individuals; STAYING the Court's January 9, 2009 Amended Order to Show Cause; discovery remains STAYED pending further Order of the Court. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 02/05/09. Associated Cases: 0:08-md-01905-RHK-JSM et al.(rhks)
|
|
GPO
Mar 02 2009
ORDER that Medtronic shall serve and file its response to 245 Motion for Recusal on or before March 6, 2009; no reply of any type shall be permitted absent further order of the court. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 03/02/09. Associated Cases: 0:08-md-01905-RHK-JSM et al.(rhks)
|
|
GPO
Mar 09 2009
ORDER DENYING (245) Motion for Recusal. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 03/09/09. Associated Cases: 0:08-md-01905-RHK-JSM et al.(rhks)
|
|
GPO
Mar 09 2009
ORDER GRANTING (259) Motion for Leave to File. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 03/09/09. Associated Cases: 0:08-md-01905-RHK-JSM et al.(rhks)
|
|
GPO
Mar 11 2009
ORDER GRANTING (257) Motion for Order for Removal. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 03/11/09. Associated Cases: 0:08-md-01905-RHK-JSM et al.(rhks)
|
|
GPO
Mar 16 2009
ORDER that no further responses to 235 Amended Order to Show Cause shall be filed absent further Order of the Court. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 03/16/09. Associated Cases: 0:08-md-01905-RHK-JSM et al.(rhks)
|
|
GPO
Apr 01 2009
ORDER DENYING letter request to file a Motion for Reconsideration of the Courts March 9, 2009 Order. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 04/01/09. (Attachments: # (1) Letter Attachment)Associated Cases: 0:08-md-01905-RHK-JSM et al.(rhks)
|
|
GPO
May 12 2009
ORDER DENYING (248) Motion for Leave to File; DENYING Plaintiffs' March 6, 2009 letter request to file a Motion for Reconsideration; DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE the Complaints in each of the 229 cases listed in the attachment hereto; STAYING the remaining cases comprising this MDL pending further Order of the Court. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 05/12/09. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment to Order) Associated Cases: 0:08-md-01905-RHK-JSM et al.(rhks)
|
|
GPO
May 13 2009
ORDER to replace attachment to the Court's May 12, 2009 Order 295. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 05/13/09. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment)Associated Cases: 0:08-md-01905-RHK-JSM et al.(rhks)
|
|
GPO
May 19 2009
ORDER that the Court's stay in this matter pursuant to its May 12, 2009 Order (Doc. No. 295) includes the time by which Plaintiffs must object to Magistrate Judge Mayeron's May 11, 2009 Order denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend the Protective Order and Compel Unredaction of FDA Documents (Doc. No. 293). (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 05/19/09. Associated Cases: 0:08-md-01905-RHK-JSM et al.(rhks)
|
|
GPO
Dec 16 2010
ORDER regarding settlement fund and escrow agreement. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 12/16/10. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 0:08-md-01905-RHK-JSM et al.(kll)
|
|
GPO
Dec 16 2010
Qualified Protective Order. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 12/16/10. Associated Cases: 0:08-md-01905-RHK-JSM et al.(kll)
|