Team New Zealand Limited v. Nautique De Geneve et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William H Pauley, III |
Case #: | 1:08-cv-02228 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:15 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Mar 06, 2008 |
Terminated: | Oct 28, 2008 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 28, 2016 4:12 AM EST |
Defendant
AC Management S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ernesto Bertarelli
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nautique De Geneve
|
|
Defendant
Societe Nautique de Geneve
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Team Alinghi, S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Team New Zealand Limited
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/21/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, February 14, 2022 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Notice of Filing Transcript
Mon 02/14 12:38 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 9/5/2008 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Transcript
Mon 02/14 12:37 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 9/5/2008 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sandra Miaskoff, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/7/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/17/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2022..(Moya, Goretti) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Notice of Filing Transcript
Mon 02/14 12:14 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/20/2008 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Transcript
Mon 02/14 12:10 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 6/20/2008 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michelle Bulkley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/7/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/17/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2022..(Moya, Goretti) |
|
Tuesday, October 28, 2008 | ||
23 | 23 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) all defendants. Document filed by Team New Zealand Limited. (Bowman, Philip) | |
Thursday, October 02, 2008 | ||
22 | 22 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 9/5/2008 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. (jn) | |
Thursday, August 07, 2008 | ||
21 | 21 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration.. Document filed by Societe Nautique de Geneve, Nautique De Geneve, Team Alinghi, S.A., AC Management S.A., Ernesto Bertarelli. (Ostrager, Barry) | |
Tuesday, August 05, 2008 | ||
20 | 20 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7/25/08 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. (ama) | |
Thursday, July 31, 2008 | ||
19 | 19 24 pgs MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration.. Document filed by Team New Zealand Limited. (Bowman, Philip) | |
Thursday, July 24, 2008 | ||
18 | 18 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 6/20/08 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. (ama) | |
Tuesday, July 22, 2008 | ||
17 | 17 SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 2 The court will hold a discovery conference eon July 25, 2008 at 10:30 a.m. to discuss the discovery issues in the joint letter submitted to the court on July 14, 2008. (Discovery Hearing set for 7/25/2008 at 10:30 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 7/21/08) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(mme) | |
Thursday, July 10, 2008 | ||
16 | 16 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley from Philip M. Bowman dated 7/7/08 The parties respectfully request that the court allow until July 14, 2008 for the submission of a joint letter regarding disputes over the discovery sought by Team New Zealand on defendants motion to compel arbitration. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. So ordered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 7/9/08) (mme) | |
Thursday, July 03, 2008 | ||
15 | 15 AFFIDAVIT of Jonathan K. Youngwood, Esq. in Support re:13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration.. Document filed by Societe Nautique de Geneve, Team Alinghi, S.A., AC Management S.A., Ernesto Bertarelli.(Ostrager, Barry) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J | ||
14 | 14 18 pgs MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration.. Document filed by Societe Nautique de Geneve, Team Alinghi, S.A., AC Management S.A., Ernesto Bertarelli. (Ostrager, Barry) | |
13 | 13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Document filed by Societe Nautique de Geneve, Team Alinghi, S.A., AC Management S.A., Ernesto Bertarelli.(Ostrager, Barry) | |
Friday, June 27, 2008 | ||
12 | 12 ORDER: Plaintiff shall file and serve its reply brief in support of its motion to remand the 08Civ.4215 action by 6/25/08. Defendants shall file and serve their motions to compel arbitration by 7/3/08. Plaintiff shall file and serve its opposition to the motions by 7/31/08. Defendants shall file and serve their replies by 8/7/08. The Court will hear oral argument on the motions to compel arbitration and on the motion to remand on September 5, 2008 at 11:00 a.m. The parties shall submit a joint letter of no more than seven pages regarding any discovery disputes relating to the motions to compel arbitration by 7/8/08. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/20/08) (tro) | |
Tuesday, June 24, 2008 | ||
11 | 11 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley from Barry R. Ostrager dated 6/9/2008 re: Requesting that the Court defer the Rule 26 requirements so the issue of the timing of a Rule 26(f) report can be addressed at the June 20, 2008 initial pretrial conference. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/23/2008) (jpo) | |
Tuesday, May 20, 2008 | ||
10 | 10 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley from Barry R. Ostrager dated 5/9/08 re: Defendants request a pre-motion conference regarding their intent to file a motion for an order compelling Plaintiff to arbitrate the claims in the Complaint and for a stay pending resolution of the motion to compel arbitration. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. This Court will hold a pre-motion conference and the initial pre-trial conference on June 20, 2008 at 11:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/19/08) (tro) | |
Friday, May 09, 2008 | ||
9 | 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Alinghi Holdings Limited as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Societe Nautique de Geneve, Team Alinghi, S.A., AC Management S.A., Ernesto Bertarelli.(Ostrager, Barry) | |
Friday, May 02, 2008 | ||
7 | 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura Denise Murphy on behalf of Societe Nautique de Geneve, Team Alinghi, S.A., AC Management S.A., Ernesto Bertarelli (Murphy, Laura) | |
Thursday, May 01, 2008 | ||
8 | 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER; that the time for defendants to answer or move with respect to the complaint in this action is extended to 5/20/2008. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/1/2008) (jp) | |
Wednesday, April 23, 2008 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan K. Youngwood on behalf of Societe Nautique de Geneve, Team Alinghi, S.A., AC Management S.A., Ernesto Bertarelli (Youngwood, Jonathan) | |
5 | 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by George S Wang on behalf of Societe Nautique de Geneve, Team Alinghi, S.A., AC Management S.A., Ernesto Bertarelli (Wang, George) | |
4 | 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Barry Robert Ostrager on behalf of Societe Nautique de Geneve, Team Alinghi, S.A., AC Management S.A., Ernesto Bertarelli (Ostrager, Barry) | |
Thursday, April 03, 2008 | ||
3 | 3 3 pgs ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/20/2008 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge William H. Pauley III. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/31/08) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(tro) | |
Thursday, March 06, 2008 | ||
2 | 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Team New Zealand Limited.(mbe) (rdz). | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Nautique De Geneve, Team Alinghi, S.A., AC Management S.A., Ernesto Bertarelli. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 643952)Document filed by Team New Zealand Limited.(mbe) (rdz). | |
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nautique De Geneve, Team Alinghi, S.A., AC Management S.A., Ernesto Bertarelli. (mbe) | ||
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (mbe) | ||
Case Designated ECF. (mbe) |