Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Bruce W Kauffman
Case #: 2:03-cv-02984
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:May 07, 2003
Terminated:Mar 01, 2005
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 5:35 PM EDT
Defendant
JOSE SANCHEZ
Represented By
DAVID L. HACKETT
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Defendant
THE CHURCH FARM SCHOOL
Represented By
DAVID L. HACKETT
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Plaintiff
BRUCE REAVIS
Represented By
ANDREW M. CALVELLI
Law Firm Of Andrew M. Calvelli
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
CFS, THE SCHOOL AT CHURCH FARM
Terminated: 07/21/2003
Represented By
DAVID L. HACKETT
Cozen O'Connor
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 01, 2005
19 19 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY JUDGE BRUCE W. KAUFFMAN ON 02/28/05. 03/01/05 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ac, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 05, 2004
18 18 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO DISCOVERY REQUEST AND PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITIONS IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 12/14/2004. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 01/17/05. EXHIBITS SHALL BE EXCHANGED BY 01/27/05 THE PARTIES SHALL FILE THEIR PRETRIAL MEMORANDA AND ANY MOTIONS IN LIMINE BY 3/7/2005. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR WEDNESDAY, 03/16/05 AT 4:30 P.M. THIS CASE WILL ENTER THE COURT'S TRIAL POOL ON 03/18/05. DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR EXPENSES AND FEES IS DENIED. SIGNED BY JUDGE BRUCE W. KAUFFMAN ON 11/04/04. 11/05/04 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ac, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2004
17 17 MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery Requests filed by THE CHURCH FARM SCHOOL.Certificate of Counsel and Supporting Memorandum of Law.(HACKETT, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, June 02, 2004
16 16 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT ADDITIONAL PARTIES SHALL BE JOINED BY JUNE 24, 2004. PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT REPORTS SHALL BE EXCHANGED BY OCTOBER 1, 2004. DEFENDANTS' EXPERT REPORTS SHALL BE EXCHANGED BY OCTOBER 15, 2004. NONDISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY OCTOBER 29, 2004. DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY OCTOBER 29, 2004. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY DECEMBER 3, 2004. EXHIBITS SHALL BE EXCHANGED BY DECEMBER 13, 2004. PARTIES SHALL FILE PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM, ETC. AND ANY MOTIONS IN LIMINE BY JANUARY 31, 2005. SIGNED BY JUDGE BRUCE W. KAUFFMAN ON 06/01/04. 06/02/04 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(ac, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2004
15 15 Joint Rule 16 Memorandum by DEFENDANT THE CHURCH FARM SCHOOL, Certificate of Service. (HACKETT, DAVID) Modified on 5/25/2004 (fh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 21, 2004
14 14 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL DEVELOP A PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN AND SHALL SUBMIT TO THE COURT, ON OR BEFORE MAY 24, 2004 AT JOINT "RULE 16 MEMORANDUM" . SIGNED BY JUDGE BRUCE W. KAUFFMAN ON 04/20/04. 04/21/04 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(ac, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 12, 2004
13 13 20 pgs ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Jose Sanchez and by THE CHURCH FARM SCHOOL with Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(HACKETT, DAVID) Modified on 4/13/2004 (fh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 31, 2004
12 12 8 pgs MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE BRUCE W. KAUFFMAN. 4/1/04 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(sc, )
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (DOCKET NO. 4) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY JUDGE BRUCE W. KAUFFMAN. 4/1/04 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(sc, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 02, 2003
10 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew M. Calvelli re: served Summons and Complaint upon Beth Beacham for THE CHURCH FARM SCHOOL by personal service. THE CHURCH FARM SCHOOL served on 6/13/2003, answer due 7/3/2003. (rv, )
Related: [-]
9 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew M. Calvelli re: served Summons and Complaint upon Beth Beacham for JOSE SANCHEZ by personal service. JOSE SANCHEZ served on 6/13/2003, answer due 7/3/2003. (rv, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 25, 2003
8 8 REPLY filed by BRUCE REAVIS to DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT, Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (rv, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 08, 2003
7 7 MOTION BY JOSE SANCHEZ, THE CHURCH FARM SCHOOL TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(rv, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2003 (rv, ).
Related: [-]
Monday, July 21, 2003
6 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOSE SANCHEZ, THE CHURCH FARM SCHOOL , filed by BRUCE REAVIS, Certificate of Service.(rv, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 07, 2003
4 4 MOTION BY CFS, THE SCHOOL AT CHURCH FARM, JOSE SANCHEZ, THE CHURCH FARM SCHOOL TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(rv, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2003 (rv, ).
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 03, 2003
5 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Marie Simmons re: served Summons and Complaint upon BAYER AG by Registered Mail (no return receipt attached). (cdd, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 24, 2003
3 3 1 pgs ORDER THAT PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF ANDREW M. CALVELLI IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO A PROPOER MOTION IN CONFORMITY WITH LOCAL RULE 83.5.2. SIGNED BY JUDGE BRUCE W. KAUFFMAN ON 6/24/03. 6/24/03 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(rv, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2003
2 2 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney ANDREW M. CALVELLI. (tj, )(Filing Fee $40.00 Receipt #889325)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against CFS, THE SCHOOL AT CHURCH FARM, JOSE SANCHEZ, THE CHURCH FARM SCHOOL ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 889324.), filed by BRUCE REAVIS.(tj, )
Related: [-]
Summons Issued; 3 Mailed to counsel 5/8/03 as to CFS, THE SCHOOL AT CHURCH FARM, JOSE SANCHEZ, THE CHURCH FARM SCHOOL. (tj, )
Related: [-]
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BRUCE REAVIS. (tj, )
Related: [-]