Vecchio v. Quest Diagnostics Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Edgardo Ramos |
Referred: | Jennifer E Willis |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-05165 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 29, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 26, 2016 3:42 AM EST |
Defendant
ExamOne LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ExamOne World Wide, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Quest Diagnostics Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Vecchio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joel Validum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandi Yip
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, December 22, 2023 | ||
3268 | 3268
misc
Status Report
Fri 12/22 3:10 PM
STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Maria Vecchio..(Badala, Salvatore) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2023 | ||
3267 | 3267
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Expedite
Mon 12/18 6:30 PM
ORDER: granting3266 Letter Motion to Expedite. The fairness hearing is scheduled for June 26, 2024, at 3:30 pm at the United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, Courtroom 619, New York, New York 10007. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/18/2023) (ama) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 12/18 6:32 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Fairness Hearing set for 6/26/2024 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 619, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (ama) |
||
Friday, December 15, 2023 | ||
3266 | 3266
motion
Expedite
Fri 12/15 3:51 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION to Expedite setting a date for a final approval hearing addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Salvatore C. Badala and Robert P. Lewis dated December 15, 2023. Document filed by Maria Vecchio..(Badala, Salvatore) |