Dewalt-Gallman v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Patrick Michael Duffy |
Referred: | Bristow Marchant |
Case #: | 9:16-cv-02332 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Jun 29, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 22, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Tue 09/05 2:24 PM
ORDER granting 24 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on 09/05/2017. (egra, ) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Fri 09/01 2:07 PM
RESPONSE in Support re24 MOTION for Attorney Fees Response filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Prince, Marshall) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Attorney Fees
Fri 08/18 10:50 AM
MOTION for Attorney Fees by Betty Dewalt-Gallman. Response to Motion due by 9/1/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(McChesney, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Memo in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A fee agrerement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B Affidavit of Paul McChesney, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C Affidavit of Deborah Dempsey, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D Consumer Price Index June 2017, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E Consumer Price Index March 2006 | ||
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Judgment
Mon 05/22 1:06 PM
JUDGMENT: It is ordered that the decision of the Commissioner is hereby reversed under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) and remanded to the Commissioner for further action consistent with the findings in the Report and Recommendation. (cper, ) |
|
22 | 22
order
Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation
Mon 05/22 12:55 PM
ORDER RULING ON 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is ordered that the decision of the Commissioner is hereby reversed under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) and remanded to the Commissioner for further action consistent with the findings in the Report and Recommendation. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on 5/22/17. (cper, ) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Reply Not to a Motion
Fri 05/19 8:33 AM
REPLY by Commissioner of Social Security Administration to19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Complaint - Social Security, filed by Betty Dewalt-Gallman . (Prince, Marshall) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Report and Recommendation
Fri 05/05 1:57 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint - Social Security, filed by Betty Dewalt-Gallman. It is recommended that the decision of the Commissioner be reversed, and that this case be remanded to the Commissioner for re-evaluation of the evidence as set forth, and for such further administration action as may be necessary. Objections to R&R due by 5/19/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 05/05/2017. (egra, ) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respoth
Plaintiff's Social Security Response Brief
Wed 03/08 6:56 AM
PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE BRIEF by Betty Dewalt-Gallman. (McChesney, Paul) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 02/22 1:58 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's reply brief due March 8, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 02/22/2017.(elac, ) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 02/21 5:37 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time by Betty Dewalt-Gallman. Response to Motion due by 3/7/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(McChesney, Paul) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
respoth
Defendant's Social Security Brief
Mon 02/06 11:40 AM
DEFENDANT'S BRIEF by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.Plaintiffs Response Brief Due by 2/21/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Prince, Marshall) |
|
Tuesday, December 27, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
respoth
Plaintiff's Social Security Brief
Tue 12/27 12:29 AM
PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF by Betty Dewalt-Gallman. Defendant Brief due by 2/6/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (McChesney, Paul) |
|
Wednesday, December 07, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 12/07 11:05 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to file Plaintiff's Brief until December 23, 2016. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 12/07/2016.(egra, ) |
|
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 12/06 4:20 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time by Betty Dewalt-Gallman. Response to Motion due by 12/20/2016. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(McChesney, Paul) |
|
Friday, November 04, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer in Social Security Case
Fri 11/04 8:45 AM
ANSWER (with Transcript of Record received) by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.Plaintiffs Brief due by 12/8/2016.(Prince, Marshall) |
|
Monday, July 18, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA-Social Security Complaint Served
Mon 07/18 1:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Betty Dewalt-Gallman. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 7/11/2016, pursuant to Local Rule 83.VII.03 answer due 11/8/2016.(McChesney, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Returns of service cards | ||
Thursday, June 30, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 06/30 3:42 PM
ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 06/30/2016. (egra, ) |
|
Wednesday, June 29, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 06/29 2:57 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Betty Dewalt-Gallman. Response to Motion due by 7/18/2016. No proposed order. Motions referred to Bristow Marchant. (egra, ) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 06/29 2:55 PM
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (egra, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Social Security Cases Only
Wed 06/29 2:29 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website., filed by Betty Dewalt-Gallman. Service due by 9/30/2016. (egra, ) |